American Honda Motor Co., Inc. v. The Coast Distribution System, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2006cv04752
Filed: August 7, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING 130 Stipulation for Order Entering Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 17, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING 127 Stipulated Request for Extension of Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING 123 Stipulation to Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 1, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 14, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. v. The Coast Distribution System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?