G&C Auto Body Inc et al v. GEICO General Insurance Company et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04898
Filed: August 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Anti-Trust Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Referring Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2009 499 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 497 Request for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/27/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
March 3, 2009 486 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS (correction of Pretrial Conference date). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/3/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 23, 2009 485 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/23/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
January 8, 2009 476 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 475 Stipulation to seal documents. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 8, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 2, 2008 473 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 471 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference, Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
October 21, 2008 463 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 461 Motion for Clarification of Stay or Alternatively, for Leave to Object to Magistrate's Ruling to Preserve Geico's Position. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/21/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 9, 2008 454 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUBPOENA UPON R. WARDELL LOVELAND re 441 Letter filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/9/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
September 23, 2008 438 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 437 Stipulation to File Under Seal Exhibits I, M, N, O. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 9, 2008 432 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 5, 2008 423 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Administrative Relief and Continuing Hearing and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 5, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 4, 2008 422 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dibble's Autobody's Administrative Relief and Continuing CMC and Hearing on pending motions. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2008 09:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 09/04/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
February 4, 2008 345 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference continued to 3/20/2008 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/4/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&C Auto Body Inc et al v. GEICO General Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?