United States of America v. Real Property et al
Case Number: 3:2006cv04903
Filed: August 14, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Drug Related Seizure of Property Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/2/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending stay. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/10/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER taking 1/9/09 case management conference off calendar. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/13/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Status Conference set for 12/5/08 is continued to 1/9/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/2/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Status Conference set for 2/8/08 is continued to 6/6/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/1/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?