Wigfall v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04968
Filed: August 16, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REFER MATTER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE LARSON re doc 66 filed by Michael Hennessey, Neu, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/7/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 1, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/1/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
March 9, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT FROM PARTIES. Parties to file status report on or before 3/19/2009. If no status report is filed on or before 3/19/2009, case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/09/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wigfall v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?