Lobb v. West Publishing Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: George C. Lobb
Defendant: Kaplan, Inc. and West Publishing Corporation
Case Number: 3:2006cv05022
Filed: August 21, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2007 26
STIPULATION of Discontinuance with Prejudice by George C. Lobb, West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan, Inc.. (Taylor, Lee) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
September 10, 2007 25 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/10/07. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 7, 2007 24
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Request and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Kaplan, Inc.. (Taylor, Lee) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
August 29, 2007 23
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
August 3, 2007 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying as moot 21 Motion for Telephonic Case Management Conference (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
July 25, 2007 20
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2007 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2007. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2007)
May 11, 2007 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE ELECTRONIC FILING IN CASES WITH UNREPRESENTED PARTIES: Case designated for electronic filing. Effective immediately all represented parties will e-file their submissions to the court. Represented parties will be required to serve paper copies by mail on unrepresented parties. Unrepresented litigants will continue to file and serve all submissions to the court in paper form unless prior leave is obtained from the assigned judge. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn Walker dated 5/11/07. Copy mailed to counsel of record. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lobb v. West Publishing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaplan, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Raymond A. Just
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George C. Lobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?