Hub International of California Insurance Services, Inc v. Kilzer et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv05227
Filed: August 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2008 61 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT MICHAEL KILZER'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 31, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 14, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT MICHAEL KILZER'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The motion is granted to the extent Kilzer seeks dissolution of the orders set forth in paragraphs B(1) and B(2) of the injunction. The motion is denied to the extent Kilzer seeks dissolution of the order set forth in paragraph B(3) of the injunction. Such denial is without prejudice to Kilzer's filing a separate motion, in which the grounds for dissolution of the remainder of the injunction, and the effect of such dissolution order on Kilzer's bankruptcy proceedings, are provided. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 14, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
September 12, 2006 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against defendant Kilzer. Plaintiff shall serve Kilzer with a copy of this order forthwith. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/12/2006. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2006)
September 7, 2006 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing defendant Capax Management and Insurance without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/7/2006. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2006)
August 30, 2006 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/8/2006 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response by defendants due by 9/5/2006 at 9:00 a.m. Any reply due by September 6, 2006 at 4:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/30/2006. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2006)
August 25, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/25/2006. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hub International of California Insurance Services, Inc v. Kilzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?