United States of America v. Real Property and Improvements located at 10 Table Bluff Road, Loreta, California

Case Number: 3:2006cv05256
Filed: August 28, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 22, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CLAIMANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART CLAIMANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND DENYING CLAIMANT'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY. re 65 , 66 , 70 , 77 , 78 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 2, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 86 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 12, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 3/19/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
October 16, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request to vacate pretrial and trial dates (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 15, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
August 28, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER AND STANDING ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property and Improvements located at 10 Table Bluff Road, Loreta, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?