Walters et al v. Newberry et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv05396
Filed: August 31, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING APRIL 25, 2012 JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/08/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
January 17, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 115 SETTING DEBTORS EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR ROBERT NEWBERRY by John Bonilla, Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Operating Engineers Vacation and Holiday Plan, Operating Engineers and Particip ating Employers Pre Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Ken Walters. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 4/25/2012 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/17/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 6, 2012 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 111 Plaintiffs' Request for Reconsideration of January 3, 2012 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/06/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 3, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING DEBTORS EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR ROBERT NEWBERRY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/03/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 7, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Debtor's Examination of Judgment Debtor Robert Newberry, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2011. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 1/18/2012 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/07/2011.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
June 3, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 3, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
August 31, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters et al v. Newberry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?