E-Smart Technologies, Inc. et al v. Drizin et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv05528
Filed: September 11, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2011 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re CONTEMPT AND SANCTIONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Taylor&Co. may file within ten (10) days of the filing of this order a declaration certifying to the attorneys fees and costs incurred in prosecuting the OSC along with supporting documentation; Plaintiff shall file within twenty (20) days of such filing its objection, if any; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/24/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 18, 2011 380 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: CIVIL CONTEMPT. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/18/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
September 24, 2010 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re CONTEMPT AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION; Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/1/2010 02:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/24/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 23, 2010 328 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATION of Facts Constituting Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/22/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
July 16, 2010 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/16/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 15, 2010 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 8/12/2010 09:00 AM before the Hon. Bernard Zimmerman; It is ordered that Mary Grace, Tamio Saito, Wayne Drizin, and Michael Gardiner shall appear in person at the settlement conference; Failure to appear will result in the entry of default or dismissal of this action as appropriate; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/15/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
June 28, 2010 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs through their CEOs and/or Presidents shall appear at the hearing on July 12, 2010, and show cause why this action should not be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Failure to appear will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice.(awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
March 5, 2010 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 306 Stipulation filed by IVI Smart Technologies Inc., E-Smart Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/5/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
January 26, 2010 304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/26/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 14, 2010 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/14/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
November 6, 2009 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 293 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/6/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
October 23, 2009 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/5/2009.. Signed Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/23/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
August 14, 2009 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/13/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 13, 2009 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Mariilyn Hall Patel granting plaintiffs' motion to extend time to 10/31/2009 to complete settlement; Status conference reset for 11/16/2009 at 3:00 pm, with a joint supplemental status report to be filed one week prior to the conference. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 12, 2009 283 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER CORRECTING DATE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE POSTED IN DOCKET NO. 279, LINE 22, OF ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/12/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
August 11, 2009 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 272 Motion to Continue (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
July 17, 2009 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (bzlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
June 30, 2009 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/30/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
May 1, 2009 253 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status Conference continued to 6/22/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/30/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
January 6, 2009 232 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Defendants' motion for summary judgment of no violation of the California UTSA is DENIED in its entirety. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on the common law unfair competition and mi sappropriation/conversion claims is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants motion relating to the appropriateness of injunctive relief is DENIED as premature. Defense counsels motion to withdraw is deferred until March 1, 2009. Douglass's motion for costs is DENIED. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E-Smart Technologies, Inc. et al v. Drizin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?