Kanawi et al v. Bechtel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Zoltan Incze, Beverly Kanawi and Salvador Aquino
Defendant: Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Fremont Investment Advisors, Bechtel Corporation, Pat Damsguard, Pat Damsgaard, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The and Peggi Knox
Intervenor: Secretary of Labor Hilda L. Solis
Case Number: 3:2006cv05566
Filed: September 11, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2011 Filing 833 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #832 . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ORDER of USCA as to #772 Notice of Appeal, filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. This appeal is dismissed. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 831 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #830 Order on Motion for Reconsideration (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #829 Motion for Reconsideration (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 11, 2011 Filing 829 MOTION for Reconsideration by Syed M.A. Hasan. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #805 . (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 827 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #818 (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 25, 2011 Filing 826 NOTICE by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi re #825 Order Joint Notice of Supplemental Decl of Mark G. Boyko in Compliance with Order Dated February 18, 2011 (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Boyko Declaration)(Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on February 18, 2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 824 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/18/2011 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 2/18/2011) re #818 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi, #805 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Memorandum of POints and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/18/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 823 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ward Kallstrom signed (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 822 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ward Kallstrom (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 2/17/2011) Modified on 2/18/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2011 Filing 821 Letter from Edward Howard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 820 RESPONSE to re #816 Letter, #812 Letter, #804 Letter, #806 Letter, #815 Letter, #817 Letter, #807 Letter by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Rebekah Freisinger)(Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 819 RESPONSE in Support re #818 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval filed bySalvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit Rust Consulting)(Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 818 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2011 10:00 AM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 817 Letter from James E. Sundergill. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2011: #1 envelope) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 Filing 816 Letter from Douglas Edward Tingley. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 30, 2010 Filing 815 Letter from Edward Howard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 814 NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors Notice of Withdrawal of Marc Avram Centor as Attorney (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 12/29/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2010 Filing 813 NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors Notice of Withdrawal of Tammy Lee Kissman as Attorney (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 12/29/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2010 Filing 812 Letter from Daniel H. Harris. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 Filing 811 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The re #808 Notice of Appearance (Perkins, Stephen) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 Filing 810 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The re #809 Notice of Appearance (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 809 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Moriarty Lane (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 808 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Bradley Perkins (Perkins, Stephen) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 22, 2010 Filing 807 Letter from Philip H. Wong. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 22, 2010 Filing 806 Letter from Hsin-Hsin M. Hsu Wong. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 20, 2010 Filing 805 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Memorandum of POints and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2011 10:00 AM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Affidavit Jerome Schlichter, #5 Affidavit Sheri O'Gorman, #6 Affidavit Stewart Brown, #7 Affidavit Jay Sushelsky, #8 Affidavit Thomas Theado, #9 Affidavit James Sturdevent, #10 Proposed Order)(Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 804 Letter from Richard Hodgson. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #801 Joint MOTION Approval of Amendment to Settlement Agreement and for An Order Finding that the Agreed Upon SEttlement Notice Satisfies the Requirements of Rule 23(e) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2010: #1 Amendment to Class Action Settlement Agreement) (crblc2, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2010 Filing 802 MEMORANDUM in Support re #801 Joint MOTION Approval of Amendment to Settlement Agreement and for An Order Finding that the Agreed Upon SEttlement Notice Satisfies the Requirements of Rule 23(e)Joint MOTION Approval of Amendment to Settlement Agreement and for An Order Finding that the Agreed Upon SEttlement Notice Satisfies the Requirements of Rule 23(e) filed bySalvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Modified on 11/29/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2010 Filing 801 Joint MOTION Approval of Amendment to Settlement Agreement and for An Order Finding that the Agreed Upon SEttlement Notice Satisfies the Requirements of Rule 23(e) filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Eastman Declaration, #2 Affidavit Marotto Declaration, #3 Affidavit Boyko Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Boyko Declaration - Amendment to Settlement Agreement, #5 Proposed Order)(Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ORDER Vacating #798 Prior Order, Preliminarily Approving Proposed Settlement. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on October 29, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010) Modified on 11/1/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2010 Filing 799 Stipulated Notice of ERRATA re #798 Order on Motion for Settlement by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 10/27/2010) Modified on 10/28/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 798 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #794 Motion for Settlement (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 14, 2010 Filing 797 Statement of Non-Opposition TO JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT filed byBechtel Corporation. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 Filing 796 Statement of Non-Opposition re #794 Joint MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #794 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 795 RESPONSE in Support re #794 Joint MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed bySalvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 794 Joint MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 793 ORDER of USCA as to #772 Notice of Appeal, filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an oversized reply brief is granted. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 792 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Matthew Armstrong filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Schlichter, Jerome) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 791 ORDER of USCA as to #772 Notice of Appeal, filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Appellants' motion for leave to file an oversized opening brief is granted. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
September 14, 2009 Filing 790 Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA re #772 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
July 24, 2009 Filing 789 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #788 . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER of USCA as to #319 Notice of Appeal filed by Fremont Investment Advisors, #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. The stipulation to dismiss the consolidated appeals, Nos. 08-16980 and 08-16997, under Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 42(b) is granted. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 787 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 4/27/07 (C/R : Joan Columbini) ; 11/13/07 (C/R : James Yeomans, Connie Kuhl) ; 7/1/08 (C/R : Belle Ball) ; 10/10/08 (C/R : Lydia Zinn) ; 10/24/08 (C/R : Lydia Zinn). (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 768 Motion to Correct Record (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
June 26, 2009 Filing 785 Reply to Opposition re 768 MOTION to Correct the Record filed bySalvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark G. Boyko, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #774 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2009)
June 19, 2009 Filing 784 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of 783 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 783 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Filing 783 Memorandum in Opposition re 768 MOTION to Correct the Record filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Filing 781 Declaration of Eric A. Long in Support of #780 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #780 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Filing 780 Memorandum in Opposition re 768 MOTION to Correct the Record filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Filing 779 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox re #774 MOTION to Seal The Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal the Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record and the Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support Ther (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Filing 778 Manual Filing Notification Regarding Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of the Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #777 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/19/2009) Modified on 6/22/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2009 Filing 777 Manual Filing Notification Regarding The Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motioin to Correct the Record filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/19/2009) Modified on 6/22/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2009 Filing 776 Proposed Order re #774 MOTION to Seal The Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal the Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record and the Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support Ther by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Filing 775 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of #774 MOTION to Seal The Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal the Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record and the Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support Ther filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) #774 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Filing 774 MOTION to Seal The Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal the Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record and the Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support Thereof filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 18, 2009 Filing 773 USCA Case Number 09-16253 USCA for #772 Notice of Appeal, filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
June 15, 2009 Filing 772 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #686 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #735 Judgment by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt # 34611033271. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement) #2 Appeal Form (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER of USCA as to #319 Notice of Appeal filed by Fremont Investment Advisors, #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Opening briefs due 7/10/09; answering brief due 8/10/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2009)
June 2, 2009 Filing 770 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jamie L. Dupree Notice of Change of Firm Name and Firm Address (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #760 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 764 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/17/09, before THE HONORABLE CHARLES R. BREYER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 28, 2009 Filing 769 Declaration of Mark G. Boyko in Support of 768 MOTION to Correct the Record filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 768 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 28, 2009 Filing 768 MOTION to Correct the Record filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2009 10:00 AM. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 28, 2009 Filing 763 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino of Manual Filing Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record, Declaration of Mark G. Boyko in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record, and Exhibits 1-8 in Support of the Declaration of Mark G. Boyko (Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 28, 2009 Filing 762 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino of Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record, Declaration of Mark G. Boyko in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record, and Exhibits 1-8 in Support of Declaration of Mark G. Boyko (Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 28, 2009 Filing 761 Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of #760 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record, Declaration of Mark G. Boyko in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record, and Exhibits in Support of Declaration filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #760 ) (Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 28, 2009 Filing 760 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record, Declaration of Mark G. Boyko in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct the Record, and Exhibits in Support of Declaration filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER re #753 Stipulation, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/26/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 21, 2009 Filing 753 STIPULATION re #737 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion and Motion REQUEST, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING, SUBJECT TO RE-NOTICE, OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #741 Motion for Extension of Time to File (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER granting application to file under seal re #583 MOTION to Seal Document : Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Documents Related to Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Exhibits to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defenda filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/13/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 13, 2009 Filing 745 Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of #744 Reply to Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #744 ) (Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 13, 2009 Filing 744 Reply to Opposition re #741 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 743 Joinder re #742 Memorandum in Opposition, in Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 742 Memorandum in Opposition re #741 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal filed byBechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 11, 2009 Filing 741 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER of USCA as to #319 Notice of Appeal filed by Fremont Investment Advisors, #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Appellants Bechtel, et al and Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s motions for an extension of time to file the opening briefs are granted. Opening briefes due 5/26/09 ; answering brief due 6/25/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 4, 2009 Filing 739 Proposed Order re #738 Brief, #737 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion and Motion by Hilda L. Solis. (Furst, Robert) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 4, 2009 Filing 738 Brief re #737 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion and Motion Memorandum in Support filed byHilda L. Solis. (Related document(s) #737 ) (Furst, Robert) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 4, 2009 Filing 737 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion, MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion and Motion filed by Hilda L. Solis. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Furst, Robert) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 4, 2009 Filing 736 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L Furst (Furst, Robert) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 735 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 734 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2009 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 4/17/2009) re #711 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Settlement filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi, #715 MOTION re #81 Protective Order to Modify MOTION re #81 Protective Order to Modify filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2009)
April 15, 2009 Filing 733 Reply to Opposition re #715 MOTION re #81 Protective Order to Modify MOTION re #81 Protective Order to Modify filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Trae Meyr)(Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #725 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #718 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 732 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Confidential Exhibits A-E to the Declaration of T. Lee Kissman by Fremont Investment Advisors. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 731 EXHIBITS A-E re #720 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman, filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #720 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 730 EXHIBITS A thru K re #721 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn, filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #721 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 727 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The re #718 MOTION to Seal Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal Proof of Service for [Proposed] Order Granting the Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal the Exhibits (A-K) to the Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of Memorandum of the Bechtel Defendants in Opposition to the Plaintiffs; Motion to Modify Protective Order (Taylor, William) (Filed on 4/10/2009) Modified on 4/13/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2009 Filing 726 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman in Support of #725 MOTION to Seal Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #725 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 725 MOTION to Seal Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carter, Grace) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 724 NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors Manual Filing Notification (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 723 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Exhibits A-K to the Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The (Taylor, William) (Filed on 4/10/2009) Modified on 4/13/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2009 Filing 722 Memorandum in Opposition to #715 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Protective Order filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 4/10/2009) Modified on 4/13/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2009 Filing 721 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of the Memorandum of the Bechtel Defendants in Opposition to #715 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Protective Order filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Manual Filing Notification)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 4/10/2009) Modified on 4/13/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2009 Filing 720 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman in Support of #719 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Protective Order (Exhibits A-E Filed Separately Under Seal) filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #719 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 719 Memorandum in Opposition re #715 MOTION re #81 Protective Order to Modify MOTION re #81 Protective Order to Modify filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 718 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits (A-K) to the Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of Memorandum of the Bechtel Defendants in Opposition to the Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Protective Order filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of the Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an ORder to File Under Seal the Exhibits (A-K) to the Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of the Memorandum of the Bechtel Defendants in Opposition to, #2 Proposed Order Granting the Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal the Exhibits (A-K) to the Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of the Memorandum of the Bechtel Defendants in Opposition to the Plaintiffs' Motion to Mod)(Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 4/10/2009) Modified on 4/13/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #716 Motion to Shorten Time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 30, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #715 MOTION re #81 Protective Order to Modify MOTION re #81 Protective Order to Modify. Responses due by 4/10/2009. Replies due by 4/15/2009. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 26, 2009 Filing 716 MOTION to Shorten Time for Court to Hear Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Protective Order filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Clark, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 26, 2009 Filing 715 MOTION re #81 Protective Order to Modify filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jerome J. Schlichter, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 714 RESPONSE in Support re #711 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Settlement Response of the Bechtel Defendants to Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature page for Proof of Service)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 713 Statement of Non-Opposition re #711 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Settlement filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #711 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 712 Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of #711 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Settlement filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #711 ) (Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 711 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Settlement filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Conlisk, Daniel) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER of USCA as to #319 Notice of Appeal filed by Fremont Investment Advisors, #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Proceedings are stayed until 4/24/09. If the opening brief is filed, the answering brief is due 5/26/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 3, 2009 Filing 709 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 3/3/9 before Judge Spero. Settlement Agreement signed. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2009)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 708 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 3/3/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/10/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER of USCA as to #319 Notice of Appeal filed by Fremont Investment Advisors, #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Opening brief due 2/23/09 ; anwering brief due 3/25/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
November 20, 2008 Filing 706 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 11/20/8 before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case settled. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/20/2008)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 705 SO ORDERED that a representative of the insurance carrier may participate via phone at the settlement conference on 11/20/8. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/17/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 704 Notice of Settlement Conference And Settlement Conference Order Settlement Conference set for 11/20/2008 09:30 AM. Settlement Conference Statement to be LODGED with Chambers by Noon, 11/17/2008.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/13/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 703 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2008 11:00 AM. Counsel are ordered to jointly call the Court from a single line shortly before 11:00 a.m. at the following telephone number (415) 522-3691. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 702 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference (Date Filed: 11/12/2008), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement Conference. (Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 701 CLERKS NOTICE (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 700 Letter from Heather Lea in response to Judge Laporte's Order of 11/5/2008. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/12/2008 10:00 AM. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 699 Reply to Opposition re #624 MOTION for Sanctions filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 6, 2008 Filing 698 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Errata to #681 the Declaration of William J. Taylor ISO Bechtel's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike New Evidence and Motion for Sanctions.pdf filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 11/6/2008) Modified on 11/7/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 5, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 696 Letter from Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. in Response to Plaintiffs' October 31, 2008 Letter. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 694 Letter from Bechtel Defendants In Response to Plaintiffs' October 31, 2008 Letter. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 4, 2008 Filing 758 Reply to Bechtel defendants' objection to plaintiffs' supplemental declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in support of plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Filing 693 Joinder re #679 Memorandum in Opposition, Joinder by Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. in the Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike "New" Evidence and Arguments Submitted with Bechtel Defendants' Reply in Support of Summary Judgment by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #682 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #669 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying #675 Motion to Seal Document (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Filing 688 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/24/2008, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 3, 2008 Filing 695 Declaration of D. Ward Kallstrom in Support of #679 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #679 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #663 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER by Judge Breyer granting in part and denying in part #366 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #384 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 430 Motion for Summary Judgment (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Filing 685 Letter from Heather Lea regarding Ct. Doc. 684. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Filing 684 Letter from William J. Taylor, Esq. to Judge Laporte Regarding Problem with Service of Plaintiffs' Letter Brief of October 31, 2008. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 683 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #682 MOTION to Seal Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal Exhibits E-H to the Declaration of D. Ward Kallstrom in Support of the Bechtel Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike "New&q " Evidence and Arguments Submitted with Bechtel Defendants' Reply in Support of Summary Judgment; and Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 37 filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #682 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 682 MOTION to Seal Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal Exhibits E-H to the Declaration of D. Ward Kallstrom in Support of the Bechtel Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike "New" Evidence and Arguments Submitted with Bechtel Defendants' Reply in Support of Summary Judgment; and Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 37 filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal)(Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 681 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of #679 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike "New" Evidence and Arguments Submitted with Bechtel Defendants' Reply in Support of Summary Judgment; and Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 37 filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-H, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit J-O)(Related document(s) #679 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 680 Declaration of D. Ward Kallstrom in Support of #679 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike "New" Evidence and Arguments Submitted with Bechtel Defendants' Reply in Support of Summary Judgment; and Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions under Fed.R.Civ.P. 37 filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Related document(s) #679 ) (McKeon, Jami) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 679 Memorandum in Opposition re #624 MOTION for Sanctions, #611 MOTION to Strike New Evidence and Arguments Submitted With Bechtel Defendants' Reply In Support of Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (McKeon, Jami) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 678 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Letter to Judge Laporte submitted under seal by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2008) Modified on 11/5/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2008 Filing 677 Proposed Order re #675 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Letter to Judge Laporte Regarding Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Filed October 31, 2008 by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 676 Declaration of Martin H. Dodd in Support of #675 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Letter to Judge Laporte Regarding Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Filed October 31, 2008 filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #675 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 675 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Letter to Judge Laporte Regarding Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Filed October 31, 2008 filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 674 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman in Support of #673 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, and C)(Related document(s) #673 ) (Kissman, Tammy) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 673 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #624 MOTION for Sanctions Opposition of Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions [Docket No. 624] filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #624 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 672 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re document submitted under seal by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2008) Modified on 11/5/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2008 Filing 671 Proposed Order re #669 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal the Reply to Bechtel Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of Plaintiffs' Opp by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 670 Declaration of Martin H. Dodd in Support of #669 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal the Reply to Bechtel Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of Plaintiffs' Opp filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #669 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 669 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal the Reply to Bechtel Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed October 31, 2008 filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 668 OBJECTIONS to Supplemental Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS OF FREMONT INVESTMENT ADVISORS, INC. TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DANIEL V. CONLISK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO BECHTEL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/30/2008) Modified on 10/31/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2008 Filing 667 OBJECTIONS to Supplemental Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Gowdy, Franklin) (Filed on 10/30/2008) Modified on 10/31/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2008 Filing 690 Supplemental Declaration of Daniel Conlisk in support of plaintiffs' opposition to #384 , 430 Bechtel defendants' motion for summary judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 666 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Supplemental Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk submitted under seal by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/29/2008) Modified on 10/31/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2008 Filing 665 Proposed Order re #663 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal the Supplemental Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 664 Declaration of Martin H. Dodd in Support of #663 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal the Supplemental Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #663 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 663 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal the Supplemental Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed October 29, 2008 filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #655 Motion to Seal (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #654 Motion to Seal (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 658 Joinder re #657 Objection Notice of Joinder and Joinder by Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. to Bechtel Defendants' Objections and Response to Plaintiffs' Binder of Exhibit Excerpts at October 24, 2008 Hearing on Summary Judgment by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 657 OBJECTIONS to (AND RESPONSE) TO PLAINTIFFS BINDER OF EXHIBIT EXCERPTS AT OCTOBER 24, 2008 HEARING ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Smith, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 656 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** OBJECTIONS to (AND RESPONSE TO) PLAINTIFFS BINDER OF EXHIBIT EXCERPTS AT OCTOBER 24, 2008 HEARING ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Smith, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/27/2008) Modified on 10/27/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2008 Filing 662 RESPONSE re #637 Order granting in part and denying in part defendants' motion for protective order filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 655 MOTION to Seal Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Bechtel Defendants' Supplemental Response to Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Manual Filing Notification)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 654 MOTION to Seal Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal the Bechtel Defendants' Response to Order Granting in Part and Denying in part Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Manual Filing Notification)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 653 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/24/2008) re #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox, #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 652 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The re #651 Proposed Order, #649 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #650 Declaration in Support,, PROOF OF SERVICE OF BECHTEL DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE BECHTEL DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SUPPORTING PAPERS (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 651 Proposed Order re #649 Notice (Other [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING BECHTEL DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE BECHTEL DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/24/2008) Modified on 10/27/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2008 Filing 650 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of #649 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. TAYLOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE BECHTEL DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) #649 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 649 NOTICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The BECHTEL DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE BECHTEL DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Manual Filing Notification)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 648 RESPONSE to re #637 Order on Motion for Protective Order Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Submission Regarding Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part the Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Protective Order by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 660 RESPONSE re #637 Order granting in part and denying in part defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 647 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The re #646 Proposed Order, #644 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #645 Declaration in Support,, Proof of Service of Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application and Supporting Documents (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 646 Proposed Order re #644 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #645 Declaration in Support,, Proposed Order Granting Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal the Bechtel Defendants' Responses to Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Protective Order by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 645 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of #644 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal the Bechtel Defendants' Response to Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) #644 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 644 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal the Bechtel Defendants' Response to Order Granting in part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Manual Filing Notification)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/23/2008) Modified on 10/24/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #626 Motion to Shorten Time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #618 Motion to Shorten Time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #614 Motion to Shorten Time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 640 Memorandum in Opposition re #617 MOTION to Strike #602 Objection, Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence in Opposition to Summary Judgment filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 639 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #638 Status Report Regarding Authentication filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #638 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 638 STATUS REPORT Regarding Authentication by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part #439 Motion for Protective Order (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 636 Letter from Plaintiffs to Magistrate Judge Laporte re Proposed Order filed 10/20/08. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 635 Proposed Order re #439 Motion for Protective Order, [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART BECHTEL DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/21/2008) Modified on 10/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2008 Filing 634 Letter Brief OCTOBER 21, 2008 LETTER BRIEF TO JUDGE ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE RE THE BECHTEL DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER THERETO filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 633 OBJECTIONS to re #630 Proposed Order Denying Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Filed By Plaintiffs in Violation of Magistrate Judge's Order by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 632 Reply Memorandum in Support of 573 Bechtel Defendants' Objections to Factual Assertions Made in Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/21/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 Filing 631 Memorandum in Opposition re #611 MOTION to Strike New Evidence and Arguments Submitted With Bechtel Defendants' Reply In Support of Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 630 Proposed Order Denying #439 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Protective Order by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/21/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 Filing 629 Notice of Joinder and Joinder re #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment and supporting documents, #581 Notice (Other), 572 Memorandum in Opposition and supporting documents, by Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/21/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 757 RESPONSE to defendants' objections to factual assertions made in plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 756 Reply Memorandum in support of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and against Fremont's opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 755 Reply Memorandum in support of plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment and against Bechtel's opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 628 Receipt from USCA for #550 certificate of record. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 627 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #626 MOTION to Shorten Time on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #626 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 626 MOTION to Shorten Time on #624 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 625 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #624 MOTION for Sanctions filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #624 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 624 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 623 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 10/17/2008 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Defendants' Motion for Protective Order #439 . (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #591 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #586 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #582 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 619 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #618 MOTION to Shorten Time for Court to Hear Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Fremont's Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence in Opposition to Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #618 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 618 MOTION to Shorten Time for Court to Hear #617 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Fremont's Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence in Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 617 MOTION to Strike #602 Objection, filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER re #603 Letter filed by Fremont Investment Advisors, #607 Letter filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 17, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 615 Declaration of Heahter Lea in Support of #614 MOTION to Shorten Time For Court To Hear Plaintiffs' MOtion to Strike New Evidence And Arguments Submitted with Bechtel Defendants Reply In Support of Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #614 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 614 MOTION to Shorten Time For Court To Hear #611 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike New Evidence And Arguments Submitted with Bechtel Defendants Reply In Support of Summary Judgment filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/15/2008) Modified on 10/16/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2008 Filing 613 Declaration of Rebekah Freisinger in Support of #611 MOTION to Strike New Evidence and Arguments Submitted With Bechtel Defendants' Reply In Support of Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #611 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 612 Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of #611 MOTION to Strike New Evidence and Arguments Submitted With Bechtel Defendants' Reply In Support of Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #611 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 611 MOTION to Strike New Evidence and Arguments Submitted With Bechtel Defendants' Reply In Support of Summary Judgment filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 610 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/10/2008, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia R. Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 608 STIPULATION Of Parties Regarding Trial by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 607 Letter from Daniel Conlisk in Response to Letter of 10/10/2008 filed by Paul Hastings. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #543 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 767 EXHIBITS B, C and D to Declaration of T. Lee Kissman re 766 Reply Memorandum filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 766 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 766 Reply Memorandum in support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 752 Declaration of Peggi S. Knox in Support of 748 Reply Memorandum filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 748 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 751 Declaration of David S. Foster, Esq. filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 750 Declaration of Sacha M. Steenhoek in Support of 748 Reply Memorandum filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 748 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 749 OBJECTIONS to plaintiff's evidence and factual assertions in opposition to #384 Motion for Summary Judgment by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 748 Reply Memorandum in support of #384 Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 605 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re documents submitted under seal by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2008) Modified on 10/14/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2008 Filing 604 Request for Judicial Notice re #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Bechtel Defendants; Declaration of Christopher J. Banks in Support Thereof filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5 - 8, #4 Exhibit 9 - 12)(Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 603 Letter from Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. regarding Plaintiffs' deficient discovery responses. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 602 OBJECTIONS to Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Their Opposition to #366 Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/10/2008) Modified on 10/14/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2008 Filing 601 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fremont Investment Advisors re #600 Notice (Other) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 600 NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors Manual Filing Notification (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 599 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman and Exhibit A in Support of Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Exhibits B, C, and D Filed Separately Under Seal) filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4)(Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 598 Proposed Order re #596 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Granting Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 597 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman in Support of #596 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #596 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 596 NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors re #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 595 Certificate of Service re documents under seal by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino . (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008) Modified on 10/14/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2008 Filing 594 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino Manual Filing Notification (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 593 Declaration of Mark G. Boyko in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Factual Assertions Made in Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 and 6)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 592 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #591 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Factual Assertions Mde in Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Accompanying Exhs. filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #591 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 591 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Factual Assertions Mde in Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Accompanying Exhs. filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 590 Declaration of Rebekah Freisinger in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandums in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Against Bechtel and Fremont's Oppositions filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 589 Declaration of Michael Wolff in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandums in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Against Bechtel and Fremont's Oppositions filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-C, #3 Exhibit 9-C, #4 Exhibit 23-C)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 588 Proposed Order re #583 MOTION to Seal Document : Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Documents Related to Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Exhibits to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defenda by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 587 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #586 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of PLaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Against Fremont's Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #586 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 586 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of PLaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Against Fremont's Opposition filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 585 Declaration of Sacha M. Steenhoek in Support of #583 MOTION to Seal Document : Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Documents Related to Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Exhibits to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defenda filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #583 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 584 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #582 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Against Bechtel's Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #582 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 583 MOTION to Seal Document : Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Documents Related to Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Exhibits to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 582 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Against Bechtel's Opposition filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 581 NOTICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The : Manual Filing Notification (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 580 REPLY to Response to Motion re #439 MOTION for Protective Order filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 579 AMENDED MINUTES Amendment to #578 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/10/2008) re 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi, 279 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Jury Demand filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 578 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/10/2008) re 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi, #279 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Jury Demand filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER by Judge Breyer granting 285 Motion to Certify Class (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 609 Memorandum in Opposition re #439 MOTION for Protective Order filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 551 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino re Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 550 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal #319 Notice of Appeal, #316 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER re #531 Stipulation for postponement of mediation filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Judge Charls R. Breyer on 10/08/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER re #537 MOTION to Seal Document 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support MOTION to Seal Document 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/08/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER re #528 Notice to file documents under seal filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/08/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER re #488 Notice to file under seal filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/08/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 545 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino of Manual Filing (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 544 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #543 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #543 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 543 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 542 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 540 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form by Fremont Investment Advisors for proceedings held on July 1, 2008 before Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 539 Amended MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Fremont's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Related to Pltf Opposition filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 538 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #537 MOTION to Seal Document 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support MOTION to Seal Document 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #537 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 537 MOTION to Seal Document 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 532 Letter from Plaintiffs Regarding Stipulation Regarding Mediation. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 531 STIPULATION and Motion for Postponement of Mediation by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 571 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of Edward S. O'Neal re 563 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 563 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 570 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of David Witz re 563 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 563 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 569 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of Steve Pomerantz re 563 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 563 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 568 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of Paul Kampner re 563 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 563 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 567 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of Ross Miller re 563 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 563 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 566 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of Al Otto re 563 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 563 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 565 Supplemental Declaration of Edward S. O'Neal in Support of 563 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 563 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 564 Memorandum in Opposition with exhibits re #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 563 Memorandum in Opposition re #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 562 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of Edward S. O'Neal re 552 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 552 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 561 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of David Witz re 552 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 552 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 560 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of Steve Pomerantz re 552 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 552 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 559 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of Paul Kampner re 552 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 552 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 558 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of Ross Miller re 552 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 552 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 557 EXHIBITS 1 & 2 of Declaration of Al Otto re 552 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 552 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 556 EXHIBITS (Part 3 of 3) to Declaration of Heather Lea re 552 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 552 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 555 EXHIBITS (Part 2 of 3) to Declaration of Heather Lea re 552 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 552 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 554 EXHIBITS (Part 1 of 3) to Declaration of Heather Lea re 552 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 552 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 553 Memorandum in Opposition with exhibits re #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 552 Memorandum in Opposition re #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 541 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 7/1/08 before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 530 Proposed Order re #528 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Proposed Order Granting FIA's Administrative Application for an Order to file Documents Under Seal in Support of FIA's Motion for Summary Judgment by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 529 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #528 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Declaration of T. Lee Kissman in Support of Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc's Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #366 , #528 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 528 NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors re #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER re #501 to file under seal the defendants' opposition to mtn for partial sj filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/06/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #499 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER re #488 to file seal plaintiffs' opposition to Fremont's Motion for SJ filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/06/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #479 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 523 Declaration of Sacha M. Steenhoek In Support Of Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Declaration of Jude Laspa In Support Of The Bechtel Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Judgment And In Support Of The Bechtel Defendants' Cross-Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Steenhoek, Sacha) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 522 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Steenhoek, Sacha) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 4, 2008 Filing 521 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Jude Laspa in Support of #512 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in Support of the Bechtel Defendants' Cross-Motion for Parital Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #512 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/4/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 576 Declaration of Peggi S. Knox in Support of 572 Memorandum in Opposition and Cross-motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 572 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 575 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of 572 Memorandum in Opposition and Cross-motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 572 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 574 Declaration of Jude Laspa in Support of 572 Memorandum in Opposition and Cross-motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 572 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 573 OBJECTIONS to Factual Assertions made in plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 572 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Cross-motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 536 Declaration of Kamon Naddaf in Support of 533 Memorandum in Opposition filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 533 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 535 Declaration of Professor Christopher M. James in Support of 533 Memorandum in Opposition filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 533 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 534 Declaration of Professor Laura T. Starks in Support of 533 Memorandum in Opposition filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 533 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 533 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 520 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re documents under seal by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 519 *** FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF #517 .DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #521 . *** Declaration of Jude Laspa in Support of #512 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment AND in Support of the Bechtel Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #512 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 518 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Granting Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 517 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT [521 Declaration of Jude Laspa in Support of #512 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment AND in Support of the Bechtel Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #512 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 516 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Peggi S. Knox in Support of #512 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment AND in Support of the Bechtel Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #512 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 515 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #512 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment AND in Support of the Bechtel Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #512 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 514 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** OBJECTIONS to Factual Assertions Made in Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 513 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Motion for SUmmary Judgment and Supporting Documents (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 512 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and The Bechtel Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 511 Declaration of David Witz in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #384 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 510 Declaration of Al Otto in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #384 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 509 Declaration of Edward S. O'Neal in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #384 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 508 Declaration of Steve Pomerantz in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #384 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 507 Declaration of Ross Miller in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #384 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 506 Declaration of Paul Kampner in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #384 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 505 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #384 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3-6, #3 Exhibit 7-12, #4 Exhibit 13-14, #5 Exhibit 15-40, #6 Exhibit 41, #7 Exhibit 56, #8 Exhibit 42-55, #9 Exhibit 57-69, #10 Exhibit 70, #11 Exhibit 71-78, #12 Errata 79, #13 Exhibit 80-104, #14 Exhibit 105, #15 Exhibit 106)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 504 Proposed Order re #499 MOTION to Seal Document s: Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Documents Related to Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Exhibits to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Part ial Summary Judgment and in Support of the Bechtel Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Civil Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11] by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 503 Proposed Order re #501 Plaintiffs' Administrative Application to File Under Seal by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 502 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #501 Plaintiffs' Administrative Application to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' MOtion for Summary Judgment and Related Exhibits and Declaration filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #501 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 501 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino Administrative Application For An Order to File Under Seal, PLaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Related to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 500 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #499 MOTION to Seal Document s: Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Documents Related to Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Exhibits to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Part ial Summary Judgment AND to the Bechtel Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Civil Local rules 79-5 and 7-11] filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #499 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 499 MOTION to Seal Document s: Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Documents Related to Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Exhibits to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment AND to Bechtel Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Civil Local Rules 79-5 and 7-11] filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 498 Declaration of David Witz in Support of Paintiffs' Opposition to #366 Fremont's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 497 Declaration of Al Otto in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #366 Fremont's Motion for Summary Judgement filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 496 Declaration of Edward S. O'Neal in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #366 Fremont's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 495 Declaration of Steve Pomerantz in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #366 Fremont's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 494 Declaration of Ross Miller in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #366 Fremont's MOtion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 493 Declaration of Paul Kampner in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #366 Fremont's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 492 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino Certificate of Service re document under seal (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 491 Declaration of Heather Lea In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #366 Fremont Investment Advisor Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3-6, #3 Exhibit 7-12, #4 Exhibit 13-14, #5 Exhibit 15-40, #6 Exhibit 41, #7 Exhibit 42-55, #8 Exhibit 56, #9 Exhibit 57-69, #10 Exhibit 70, #11 Exhibit 71-78, #12 Exhibit 79, #13 Exhibit 80-104, #14 Exhibit 105, #15 Exhibit 106)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 490 Proposed Order re #488 Plaintiffs' Administrative Application to File Under Seal by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 489 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #488 Plaintiffs' Administrative Leave to File Under Seal filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #488 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 488 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Fremont Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Related to Plaintiffs' Opposition (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 487 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY. SEE ABOVE #486 *** NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino of Manual Filing Notification (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 486 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino of Manual Filing Notification (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 485 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 484 OBJECTIONS to Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 483 Proposed Order re #479 Granting Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 482 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman in Support of #479 , #480 Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 481 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY. SEE ABOVE #479 *** NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors re #477 Notice (Other) Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 480 ERRATA re #479 MOTION to Seal Document #477 Notice (Other) Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs MOTION to Seal Document #477 Notice (Other) Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 479 MOTION to Seal Document #477 Notice (Other) Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 478 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fremont Investment Advisors re #477 Notice (Other) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 477 NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors Manual Filing Notification (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER of USCA as to #319 Notice of Appeal filed by Fremont Investment Advisors, #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. The motion to consolidate these appeals is granted. Appeal Nos. 08-16980 and 08-16997 are consolidated. Consolidated opening brief due 12/24/08 ; consolidated answering brief due 1/23/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 2, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #439 MOTION for Protective Order. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2008 10:30 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2008 Filing 475 Letter from All Parties in Compliance with Judge Laporte's Order of 9/30/2008. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part #442 Motion to Shorten Time (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 473 Letter from Grace Carter to Magistrate Judge Laporte. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 472 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino re 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/1/2008) Modified on 10/2/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2008 Filing 471 Memorandum in Opposition re #442 MOTION to Shorten Time for Court to Hear Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Local Rule 6.3 filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER by Judge Breyer denying #461 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 469 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino re 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 9/30/2008) Modified on 10/1/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' SEPTEMBER 26, 2008 LETTER AND THE BECHTEL DEFENDANTS' SEPTEMBER 29, 2008 LETTER re #464 Letter Brief, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox, #453 Letter filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 30, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 467 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motions Hearing set for 10/24/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 466 Letter from Jerome Schlichter on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 465 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing John A. Skelton as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 29, 2008 Filing 464 Letter Brief SEPTEMBER 29, 2008 LETTER BRIEF TO JUDGE ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE RE REQUEST THAT COURT GRANT PROTECTIVE ORDER QUASHING PLAINTIFFS 30(B)(6) NOTICE OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 29, 2008 Filing 463 Proposed Order re #461 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 29, 2008 Filing 462 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #461 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #461 ) (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 29, 2008 Filing 461 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER re #429 Letter filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi, #451 Letter Brief filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 29, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 459 REDACTION : Redacted Declaration of Peggi Knox in Support of #384 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C and D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G through UU, #7 Exhibit VV, #8 Errata WW and XX, #9 Exhibit YY, #10 Exhibit ZZ through DDD, #11 Exhibit EEE, #12 Exhibit FFF trhough NNN)(Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/26/2008) Modified on 9/29/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2008 Filing 458 REDACTION : Redacted Declaration of Lynn Soderstrom in Support of #384 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, Part 1, #9 Exhibit H Part 2)(Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/26/2008) Modified on 9/29/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2008 Filing 457 REDACTION : Redacted Declaration of Susan Grisso in Support of #384 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/26/2008) Modified on 9/29/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2008 Filing 456 Declaration of Lynn Soderstrom in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Supplemental Declaration of Lynn Soderstrom] filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 455 Declaration of Susan Grisso in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Supplemental Declaration of Susan Grisso] filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 454 Letter from Grace A. Carter, Esq. Responding to Plaintiffs' Letter Brief Filed On September 26, 2008. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence to Heather Lea of 9/26/08, #2 Correspondence to Heather Lea of 9/26/08)(Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 453 Letter from Plaintiffs to Magistrate Judge Laporte. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 451 Letter Brief Letter Brief from Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Attorney to Magistrate Judge Laporte filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 443 Proposed Order re #442 MOTION to Shorten Time for Court to Hear Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Local Rule 6.3 by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 442 MOTION to Shorten Time for Court to Hear #439 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Local Rule 6.3 filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 9/25/2008) Modified on 9/26/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2008 Filing 441 Proposed Order re #439 MOTION for Protective Order by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 440 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of #439 MOTION for Protective Order filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #439 ) (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 439 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 429 Letter from Plaintiffs' Attorneys to Magistrate Judge Laporte. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #419 Motion to Seal Document. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 24, 2008 CASE REFERRED to ADR Program for Mediation #415 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 421 Proposed Order re #419 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 420 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #419 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #419 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 419 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 418 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Amendment to #409 Certificate of Service. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 754 EXHIBITS 11 - 18 re #287 Declaration of Mark G. Boyko, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #287 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 452 EXHIBITS 1, 4-48, and 50-87 re 394 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 394 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 450 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Peggi S. Knox in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2008 10:00 AM. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #289 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' SEPTEMBER 19, 2008 LETTER re #359 Letter filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi, #383 Letter Brief filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 22, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER re: mediation (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #402 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #380 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #376 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #363 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 410 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino Certificate of Service re Sealed Documents to Lea Declaration (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 394 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in support filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 449 Amended Declaration of Peggi S. Knox filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 448 Declaration of Peggi S. Knox (Part 3 of 3) in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 447 Declaration of Peggi S. Knox (Part 2 of 3) in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 446 Declaration of Peggi S. Knox (Part 1 of 3) in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 445 Declaration of Christopher Ahearn in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 444 Declaration of Ronald D. Peyton filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 438 Declaration of Chris Allen in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 437 Declaration of Lavina Mehta filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 436 Declaration of Jude Laspa in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 435 Declaration of Steven R. Grenadier in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 434 Declaration of Stuart M. Lewis in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 433 Declaration of W. Foster Wollen filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 432 Declaration of Susan Grisso in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 431 Declaration of Lynn Soderstrom in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 430 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 428 Declaration of Charles H. Lesem in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #366 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 427 Declaration of Deborah Duncan in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #366 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 426 EXHIBITS re #367 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman, filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #367 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 425 Declaration of Albert Kirschbaum in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #366 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 424 Declaration of Avard Walker in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #366 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 423 Declaration of David Redo in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #366 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 409 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #376 , #378 , #379 , #380 , #381 , #382 and documents submitted under seal by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/26/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 408 Proposed Order re #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 407 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Jude Laspa in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 406 Proposed Order re #402 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents under Seal to Lea Declaration by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 405 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of W. Foster Wollen in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 404 Declaration of Martin H. Dodd in Support of #402 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents under Seal to Lea Declaration filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #402 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 403 Declaration of Lynn Soderstrom in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Supplemental Declaration of Lynn Soderstrom] filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 402 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents under Seal to Lea Declaration filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 401 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Lynn Soderstrom in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 400 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Ronald D. Peyton in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 399 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Lavina Mehta in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 398 Proposed Order re 394 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 397 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Stuart M. Lewis in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 396 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of 394 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) 394 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 395 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Charles H. Lesem in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 393 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #407 . *** Declaration of Jude Laspa in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byPeggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/23/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 392 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Peggi S. Knox in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Amended Declaration of Peggi S. Knox] filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 391 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Peggi S. Knox in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 390 Declaration of Susan M. Grisso in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Supplemental Declaration of Susan M. Grisso] filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 389 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Susan M. Grisso in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 388 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Steven M. Grenadier in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 387 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Chris Allen in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 386 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #384 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 385 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Brief in Support of the Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 383 Letter Brief re #359 Letter In Response to Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Letter to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #359 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 382 Proposed Order Granting #380 Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Related to Exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 381 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #380 Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Related to Exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 380 MOTION to Seal : Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Related to Exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 379 Proposed Order Granting #376 Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Related to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 378 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #376 Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Related to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 377 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fremont Investment Advisors re #367 , #386 , #369 , #370 , #371 and #372 Declarations in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 376 MOTION to Seal : Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal Related to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 375 NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors re #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Manual Filing Notification (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 374 Proposed Order re #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Proposed Order Granting Defendant Fremont Invetment Advisors, Inc.'s Motion for summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 373 Declaration of Grace A. Carter in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 372 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Charles H. Lesem in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 371 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Deborah Duncan in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 370 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Avard Walker in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 369 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of David Redo in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 368 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Declaration of Albert Kirschbaum in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 367 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman in Support of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 366 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED. SEE ORDER #526 *** MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 10/16/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 365 Proposed Order re #363 MOTION to Seal Document Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Fremont Investment Advisor, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 364 Declaration of Stuart E. Vaughn in Support of #363 MOTION to Seal Document Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Fremont Investment Advisor, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #363 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 363 MOTION to Seal Document Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Administrative Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Fremont Investment Advisor, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 362 Reply to Opposition Plaintiffs' Response to #351 Defendants' Objections to Evidence Submitted by Plaintiffs in Connection with Their Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 361 Declaration of Mark G. Boyko in Support of #360 Reply to Opposition filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #360 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 360 Reply to Opposition Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of 285 Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 359 Letter from Plaintiffs' Attorneys to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #356 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Matthew Armstrong) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #355 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Jason P. Kelly) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 17, 2008 Filing 356 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Matthew Armstrong) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611023470.) filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 17, 2008 Filing 355 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jason P. Kelly) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611023471.) filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER setting revised page limits re #352 Stipulation filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/17/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER by Judge Breyer denying #341 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot #344 Motion to Shorten Time; denying #306 Motion to Continue (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 352 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Revised Page Limits for Motions for Summary Judgment Opening Briefs and Oppositions Briefs by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 351 OBJECTIONS to re #287 Declaration in Support, and Evidence Submitted By Plaintiffs In Connection with Renewed Motion for Class Certification by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Spicer, Amy) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 350 Declaration of Lisa S. Serebin in Support of #347 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Class Certification filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #347 ) (Spicer, Amy) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 349 Joinder re #347 Memorandum in Opposition, Notice Of Joinder And Joinder By Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. To The Bechtel Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion For Class Certification by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 348 Declaration of Peggi S. Knox in Support of #347 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Class Certification filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #347 ) (Spicer, Amy) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 347 Memorandum in Opposition re 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Spicer, Amy) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 346 Proposed Order re #344 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time for Court to Hear Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Defendants' Refusal to Comply with the Court's September 3rd and 5th Orders by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 345 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #344 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time for Court to Hear Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Defendants' Refusal to Comply with the Court's September 3rd and 5th Orders filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #344 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 344 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time for Court to Hear #341 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Defendants' Refusal to Comply with the Court's September 3rd and 5th Orders filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/12/2008) Modified on 9/15/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2008 Filing 343 Proposed Order re #341 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions for Defendants' Refusal to Comply with the Court's September 3rd and 5th Orders by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 342 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #341 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions for Defendants' Refusal to Comply with the Court's September 3rd and 5th Orders filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 341 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions for Defendants' Refusal to Comply with the Court's September 3rd and 5th Orders filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 340 Joinder re #339 Reply to Opposition Notice of Joinder And Joinder By Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. To The Bechtel Defendants' Reply To Plaintiffs' Opposition To Motion To Strike Jury Demand by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 339 Reply to #303 Opposition TO MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 9/12/2008) Modified on 9/15/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2008 Filing 338 USCA Case Number 08-16997 USCA for #319 Notice of Appeal filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #330 Motion for Leave to File (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 336 STIPULATION re #330 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Not More Than Twenty-Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Twenty-Five Page Limit as agreed to by Plaintiffs and Defendants, filed today by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 11, 2008 Filing 335 CLERK'S NOTICE, CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2008 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Briefing schedule to remain as set. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
September 11, 2008 Filing 334 USCA Case Number 08-16980 USCA for #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
September 11, 2008 Filing 333 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to #330 Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Brief Not More Than Twenty-Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Twenty-Five Page Limit filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/11/2008) Modified on 9/12/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2008 Filing 332 Proposed Order re #330 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Not More Than Twenty-Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Twenty-Five Page Limit by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 10, 2008 Filing 331 Declaration of D. Ward Kallstrom in Support of #330 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Not More Than Twenty-Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Twenty-Five Page Limit filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #330 ) (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 10, 2008 Filing 330 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Not More Than Twenty-Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Twenty-Five Page Limit filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' SEPTEMBER 5, 2008 LETTER re #314 Letter filed by Fremont Investment Advisors, #298 Letter filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi, #321 Letter Brief, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 10, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 10, 2008 Filing 328 Letter from Plaintiffs' Attorneys to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte re Reply regarding location of depositions of Plaintiffs' experts. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' SEPTEMBER 4, 2008 LETTER re #313 Letter filed by Fremont Investment Advisors, #320 Letter Brief, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox, #296 Letter filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 9, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 326 Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of #325 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #325 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 325 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Oppposition to #305 Defendants' Motion to Shorten Time for Court to Hear Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay or Continue Trial and Related Dates filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/9/2008) Modified on 9/10/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER Denying Motion to Shorten (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 323 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel re #319 appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2008: #1 Docket sheet) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2008 Filing 322 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #319 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2008: #1 Appeal Form) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2008 Filing 321 Letter Brief SEPTEMBER 8, 2008 LETTER BRIEF TO JUDGE ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE RE SUBMISSION OF BECHTEL DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS LETTER OF SEPTEMBER 5, 2008 (CT. DKT. 298) filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 320 Letter Brief SEPTEMBER 8, 2008 LETTER BRIEF TO JUDGE ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE RE SUBMISSION OF BECHTEL DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS LETTER OF SEPTEMBER 4, 2008 (CT. DKT. 296) filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 319 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #297 Order, #295 Order by Fremont Investment Advisors. Filing fee $ 455. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 318 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel re #316 appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2008: #1 Docket sheet) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2008 Filing 317 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #316 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2008: #1 Appeal Form) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANT'S EXPERTS by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #300 Ex Parte Application (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 314 Letter from Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Responding to Plaintiffs' Letter Dated September 5, 2008 (Docket No. 298). (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 313 Letter from Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Responding to Plaintiffs' Letter Dated September 4, 2008 (Docket No. 296). (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 312 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of #309 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion , DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. TAYLOR IN SUPPORT OF THE BECHTEL DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO SEPTEMBER 8, 2008 FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITH AMENDED EXHIBIT A filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit A, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) #311 , #310 , #309 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/8/2008) Modified on 9/9/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2008 Filing 311 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The re #310 Declaration in Support,, #308 Letter Brief, #309 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Proof of Service Via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 310 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of #309 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. TAYLOR IN SUPPORT OF THE BECHTEL DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO SEPTEMBER 8, 2008 FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) #309 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 309 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition THE BECHTEL DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO #300 PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO SEPTEMBER 8, 2008 FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/8/2008) Modified on 9/9/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2008 Filing 308 Letter Brief SEPTEMBER 8, 2008 LETTER TO JUDGE ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE RE SUBMISSION OF BECHTEL DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 316 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #295 Order by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. Filing fee $ 455. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2008: #1 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2008 Filing 307 Declaration of Grace A. Carter in Support of #306 Joint MOTION to Continue THE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Grace A. Carter, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Grace Carter re Motion to continue Trial, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Grace Carter re Motion to Continue Trial, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Grace Carter re Motion to Continue Trial, #5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Grace Carter re Motion to Continue Trial, #6 Exhibit F to Declaration of Grace Carter re Motion to Continue Trial, #7 Exhibit G to Declaration of Grace Carter re Motion to Continue Trial, #8 Exhibit H to Declaration of Grace Carter re Motion to Continue Trial)(Related document(s) #306 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 306 Joint MOTION to Continue THE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 305 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR COURT TO HEAR DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY OR CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6.3 filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 304 Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of #303 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike Jury Demand filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #303 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 303 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to #279 Motion to Strike Jury Demand filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2008 Filing 302 Proposed Order re #300 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to September 8, 2008 for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Compel Depositions of Defendants' Experts by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 301 Declaration of Martin H. Dodd in Support of #300 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to September 8, 2008 for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Compel Depositions of Defendants' Experts filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #300 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 300 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to September 8, 2008 for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Compel Depositions of Defendants' Experts filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 299 Letter from Plaintiffs' Attorney to Magistrate Judge Laporte re Emergency Motion. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 298 Letter from Plaintiffs' Attorneys to Magistrate Judge Laporte dated September 5, 2008. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER Re: Doc. 252. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on September 5, 2008. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 4, 2008 Filing 296 Letter from Plaintiffs' Attorneys to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER re #275 Objection filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox, #274 Objection filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. Signed by Judge Breyer on 9/3/2008. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 294 Reply Memorandum To August 28, 2008 Order Regarding Defendant's Argument That The Fiduciary Exception Does Not Apply to Settlor Functions filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Steenhoek, Sacha) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 293 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino re #291 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 292 Proposed Order re #289 MOTION to Seal Document #287 Declaration in Support, PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHS. 11 THROUGH 18 by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 291 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino Documents Submitted Under Seal (Exhs. 11 through 18 to Mark G. Boyko Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed Aug. 28, 2008) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 290 Declaration of Martin H. Dodd in Support of #289 MOTION to Seal Document #287 Declaration in Support, PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHS. 11 THROUGH 18 filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #289 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 289 MOTION to Seal Document #287 Declaration in Support, PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHS. 11 THROUGH 18 filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 288 Proposed Order re 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 287 Declaration of Mark G. Boyko in Support of 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibits 11 to 18)(Related document(s) 285 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 286 Declaration of Jerome J. Schlichter in Support of 285 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum in Support filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhbit A, #2 Exhbit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 285 ) (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER re #275 Objection filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Signed by Judge Breyer on 8/28/2008. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 26, 2008 Filing 283 Reply Memorandum Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Magistrate Judge's Orders Compelling Production filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 282 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino Joint Report to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Appointment of Special Master (Dodd, Martin) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 281 MOTION for Joinder Notice of Joinder and Joinder by Defendants Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc. in Motion to Strike Jury Demand brought by Defendants Bechtel Corporation, The Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, and Peggi Knox filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 280 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Jury Demand by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 279 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Jury Demand filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER re #275 Objection filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox, #274 Objection filed by Fremont Investment Advisors. Signed by Judge Breyer on 8/21/2008. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 20, 2008 Filing 277 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #275 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Orders Compelling In Part Disclosure of Attorney-Client Privilege Documents filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #275 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 20, 2008 Filing 276 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #275 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Orders Compelling In Part Disclosure of Attorney-Client Privilege Documents filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #275 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 20, 2008 Filing 275 OBJECTIONS to Magistrate Judge's Orders Compelling In Part Disclosure of Attorney-Client Privilege Documents by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 20, 2008 Filing 274 OBJECTIONS to Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Compelling Production of Privileged Documents by Fremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER Following In Camera Review re #242 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Discovery,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth Laporte on 8/13/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER by Judge Laporte denying #262 Defendants' Joint Motion to Enlarge Time for Expert Discovery (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 14, 2008 Filing 271 Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk #269 in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 to 13)(Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 8/14/2008) Modified on 8/18/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2008 Filing 270 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #271 . *** Declaration in Support of #269 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed byBeverly Kanawi. (Related document(s) #269 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 8/13/2008) Modified on 8/14/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2008 Filing 269 Memorandum in Opposition #262 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Beverly Kanawi. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 8/13/2008) Modified on 8/18/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 13, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 267 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Fremont Investment Advisors re #262 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Joint Motion to Enlarge Time re Expert Discovery and to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Opposition and Supporting Documents, #263 Declaration of Grace A. Carter, #264 Declaration of William J. Taylor, #265 Proposed Order, #266 Proposed Order. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 8/11/2008) Modified on 8/12/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2008 Filing 266 Proposed Order re #262 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Joint Motion to Enlarge Time re Expert Discovery and to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Opposition [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Enlarge Time re Expert Discovery by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Fremont Investment Advisors. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 265 Proposed Order re #262 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Joint Motion to Enlarge Time re Expert Discovery and to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Opposition [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion to Enlarge Time re Expert Discovery by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Fremont Investment Advisors. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 264 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of #262 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Joint Motion to Enlarge Time re Expert Discovery and to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Opposition filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Fremont Investment Advisors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A thru G, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) #262 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 263 Declaration of Grace A. Carter in Support of #261 Letter, #262 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Joint Motion to Enlarge Time re Expert Discovery and to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Opposition Declaration of Grace A. Carter in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure and to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Opposition filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Fremont Investment Advisors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A thru E, #2 Exhibit Exhibits F thru I)(Related document(s) #261 , #262 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 262 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Joint Motion to Enlarge Time re Expert Discovery and to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Opposition filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Fremont Investment Advisors. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 261 Letter from William J. Taylor Enclosing Defendants' Joint Motion to Enlarge Time re Expert Discovery and to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Opposition and accompanying papers. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 6, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
July 23, 2008 Filing 259 REDACTION of Declaration of Peggi Knox in Support of Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, Part 1, #6 Exhibit C, Part 2, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H)(Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 7/23/2008)
July 23, 2008 Filing 258 REDACTION Cover Sheet to Redacted Declaration of Peggi Knox by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 7/23/2008)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER GRANTING Bechtel Defendants' Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal #252 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 257 EXHIBITS re #215 Declaration of Peggi Knox, filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #215 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #252 Motion to seal by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 7/21/2008) Modified on 7/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2008 Filing 254 Proposed Order re #252 Motion to seal, by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 7/21/2008) Modified on 7/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2008 Filing 253 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #252 Motion to File Under Seal filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Related document(s) #215 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 7/21/2008) Modified on 7/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2008 Filing 252 MOTION to Seal Document #215 Declaration in Opposition,, Motion filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 15, 2008 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conferences held by HAH on July 8 and July 15. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2008)
July 14, 2008 Filing 251 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/01/08, before Judge Elizabeth Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2008. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 250 NOTICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The BECHTEL DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION REGARDING PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS DESIGNATED FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW BY PLAINTIFFS (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 249 NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Submission of Privileged Documents Chosen by Plaintiffs for In Camera Review (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 8, 2008 Filing 248 ERRATA re #245 Appendix [Errata to Bechtel Defendants' Supplemental Submission Regarding Privileged Documents (Changes to Appendix A, Item 1 and to Appendix B)] by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 8, 2008 Filing 247 NOTICE by Fremont Investment Advisors Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Submission of Privileged Documents for In Camera Review (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 8, 2008 Filing 246 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino Plaintiffs' Designation of Representative Documents Listed on Defendants' Privilege Logs in Conformity with the Court's July 1, 2008 Order (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 8, 2008 Filing 245 Appendix BECHTEL DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION REGARDING PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 8, 2008 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference heldon 7/8/08 by HAH. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 7/15/08 at 2:00 p.m. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FOCUS TOPICS re #243 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/7/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 3, 2008 Filing 243 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Focus Topics by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #202 and GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Expedited Discovery Procedures #206 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2008: #1 Order) (lmh, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2008 Filing 241 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 7/1/2008 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privileg #202 and Motion for Expedited Discovery #206 . (Court Reporter Belle Ball). (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/1/2008)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #239 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Mark G. Boyko) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
June 26, 2008 Filing 238 Declaration of Marc A. Centor in Support of #237 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Marc A. Centor ISO of Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion to Strike filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #237 ) (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 26, 2008 Filing 237 Memorandum in Opposition re #233 MOTION to Strike #225 Brief, #227 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, MOTION to Strike #225 Brief, #227 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Centor, Marc) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 25, 2008 Filing 239 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Mark G. Boyko) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020569.) filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
June 25, 2008 Filing 236 Memorandum in Opposition re #233 MOTION to Strike #225 Brief, #227 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, MOTION to Strike #225 Brief, #227 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
June 25, 2008 Filing 235 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #220 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Application For an Order to File Under Seal Related to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Application to File Documents Under Seal filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
June 24, 2008 Filing 234 Declaration of Jamie L. Dupree and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #233 Motion to Strike Untimely Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 Filing 233 MOTION to Strike #225 Brief, #227 Opposition to Motion, filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 Filing 232 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The re #230 Declaration in Support,, #229 Declaration in Support,, #227 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #231 Request for Judicial Notice,, Proof of Service Via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 Filing 231 Request for Judicial Notice re #227 Opposition to Motion, Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #227 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 Filing 230 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of #227 Opposition to Motion, Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Taylor Signature to Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit F to Taylor Declaration)(Related document(s) #227 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 Filing 229 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #227 Opposition, Signature Page for Christopher M. Ahearn Declaration in Support of Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Christopher M. Ahearn Signature)(Related document(s) #228 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 Filing 228 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of #227 Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn in Support of Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #227 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 Filing 227 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to #206 Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2008 Filing 226 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman in Support of #225 Brief, Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #225 ) (Kissman, Tammy) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 Filing 225 Brief re #206 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures Defendant Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #206 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 Filing 224 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino re Plaintiffs' Sealed Documents in connection with Lea Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply on their Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 223 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #222 Reply Memorandum, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #222 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 222 Reply Memorandum Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their #202 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/20/2008) Modified on 6/23/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2008 Filing 221 Declaration of Jamie L Dupree in Support of #220 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Application For an Order to File Under Seal Related to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #220 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 220 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Application For an Order to File Under Seal Related to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege Filed June 20, 2008 filed by Beverly Kanawi. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 219 CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 18, 2008 Filing 218 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Ahearn [Supplemental Declaration of Chrisopher M. Ahearn (Attaching Corrected Exhibit I) in Support of Bechtel Defendants' Opposition to #202 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, Part 1, #2 Exhibit I, Part 2, #3 Exhibit I, Part 3)(Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 6/18/2008) Modified on 6/19/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2008 Filing 217 ERRATA re #212 Memorandum in Opposition, by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 18, 2008 Filing 216 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Ahearn in Opposition to #202 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, Part 1, #8 Exhibit G, Part 2, #9 Exhibit G, Part 3, #10 Exhibit G, Part 4, #11 Exhibit G, Part 5, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, Part 1, #14 Exhibit I, Part 2)(Related document(s) #202 ) (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 215 DECLARATION of Peggi Knox in Opposition to #202 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #202 ) (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 214 DECLARATION of Mary Quazzo in Opposition to #202 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #202 ) (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 213 DECLARATION of Jude Laspa in Opposition to #202 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Related document(s) #202 ) (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 212 Memorandum in Opposition re #202 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 211 Declaration of T. Lee Kissman in Support of #210 Brief, Opposition to Motion to Compel filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #210 ) (Kissman, Tammy) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 210 Brief re #202 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed byFremont Investment Advisors. (Related document(s) #202 ) (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re #205 Stipulation filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on June 17, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 208 Proposed Order re #206 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 207 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #206 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #206 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 206 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Expedited Discovery Procedures filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 16, 2008 Filing 205 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion Regarding Expedited Discovery Procedures by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/16/2008)
June 6, 2008 Filing 204 Proposed Order re #202 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 6, 2008 Filing 203 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #202 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to C, #2 Exhibit D - Part 1, #3 Exhibit D - Part 2, #4 Exhibit D - Part 3, #5 Exhibit E - Part 1, #6 Exhibit E - Part 2, #7 Exhibit E - Part 3, #8 Exhibits F to H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibits J to N, #11 Exhibit O - Part 1, #12 Exhibit O - Part 2, #13 Exhibits P to Q)(Related document(s) #202 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 6, 2008 Filing 202 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents Wrongfully Withheld and/or Redacted on the Basis of Relevance and/or Privilege filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 5, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 9/19/2008. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2008 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #200 Stipulation filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on June 5, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008)
June 3, 2008 Filing 200 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting New Case Deadlines by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 6/3/2008)
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re #198 Stipulation filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on May 30, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 29, 2008 Filing 198 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion Regarding Privilege Logs and Fiduciary Exception to Attorney Client Privilege by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #195 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 196 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox re #195 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 195 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Ellen L. Perlioni) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611019251.) filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/1/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/16/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 193 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/16/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 5/16/2008). Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 192 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 191 BECHTEL DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO #166 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to Amended Complaint byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 4/22/2008) Modified on 4/23/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2008 Filing 190 Fremont Investment Advisors, Inc.'s Answer to #166 Third Amended Complaint ANSWER to Amended Complaint byFremont Investment Advisors. (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 4/22/2008) Modified on 4/23/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2008 Filing 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Third Amended Complaint and summons by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/17/2008) Modified on 4/18/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #175 Motion (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #169 Ex Parte Application (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER re #156 Stipulation filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi Further Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2008 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/03/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
April 3, 2008 Filing 185 Reply to Opposition TO #175 BECHTEL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 4/3/2008) Modified on 4/4/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2008 Filing 184 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino re #180 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #181 Declaration of Jamie L. Dupree, #182 Declaration of Heather Lea and #183 Proposed Order. Certificate of Service (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/2/2008) Modified on 4/3/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2008 Filing 183 Proposed Order re #175 Motion for Additional Time to Produce ESI by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/2/2008) Modified on 4/3/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2008 Filing 182 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #180 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Lea Declaration)(Related document(s) #180 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/2/2008)
April 2, 2008 Filing 181 Declaration of Jamie L. Dupree in Support of #180 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #180 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/2/2008)
April 2, 2008 Filing 180 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to #175 Bechtel Defendants' Motion for Additional Time to Complete Production of Electronically Stored Information filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/2/2008) Modified on 4/3/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2008 Filing 179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Kanawi re #176 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #177 Declaration in Support, #178 Proposed Order, Certificate of Service (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
April 1, 2008 Filing 178 Proposed Order re #175 Motion for Additional Time to Produce ESI, [Proposed] Order Denying Bechtel Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Beverly Kanawi. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/1/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2008 Filing 177 Declaration of Heathter Lea in Support of #176 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bechtel Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed byBeverly Kanawi. (Related document(s) #176 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
April 1, 2008 Filing 176 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to #175 Bechtel Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed byBeverly Kanawi. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/1/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2008 Filing 175 MOTION For Additional Time To Produce ESI Correction of Docket #171 filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 31, 2008 Filing 174 Declaration of Ellen L. Perlioni In Support of Bechtel's Motion For Additional Time To Produce ESI filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 31, 2008 Filing 173 Declaration of D. Ward Kallstrom In Support of Bechtel's Motion For Additional Time to Produce ESI filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 31, 2008 Filing 172 Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn In Support of Motion For Additional Time To Produce ESI filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 31, 2008 Filing 171 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #175 *** MOTION For Additional Time To Complete Production of ESI filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 3/31/2008) Modified on 4/1/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2008 Filing 170 Declaration of D. Ward Kallstrom in Support of #169 Ex Parte Application FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #169 ) (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 31, 2008 Filing 169 Ex Parte Application FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 168 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 24, 2008 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 3/24/08 by HAH. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 19, 2008 Filing 167 Third Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to Fremont Investment Advisors. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2008 Filing 166 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial Class Action against all defendants. Filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 17, 2008 Filing 165 CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2008 08:30 AM. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Breyer granting #150 Motion for Leave to File (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 163 AFFIDAVIT of D. Ward Kallstrom in Opposition to #150 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 3/14/2008) Modified on 3/17/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2008 Filing 162 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Limited Opposition to #150 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 3/14/2008) Modified on 3/17/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Substituting re #160 Stipulation and Order,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/7/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #157 Stipulation, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 7, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 Filing 159 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Substituting a Corrected Exhibit A to Lea Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER re #156 Stipulation filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi Further Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/05/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 3, 2008 Filing 157 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING DUE DATES FOR DEFENDANTS HARD-COPY DOCUMENT PRIVILEGE LOG AND FOR PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED DOCUMENTS by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 Filing 156 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #154 Stipulation, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 22, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 154 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Continuing Due Date for Defendants' Privilege Log by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 153 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #154 . *** STIPULATION and Proposed Order Continuing Due Date for Defendants' Privilege Log by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/22/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2008 Filing 152 Proposed Order re #150 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint and To Add a Party by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 151 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #150 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint and To Add a Party filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to B, #2 Exhibits C to D, #3 Exhibits E to J)(Related document(s) #150 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 150 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint and To Add a Party filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER re #148 Stipulation filed by Salvador Aquino, Beverly Kanawi Further Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2008 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/11/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 148 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
January 31, 2008 Filing 147 [AMENDED]...REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Held on 11/13/2007 before Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte - [Court Reporter: James Yeomans]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2008)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 18, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2008)
January 15, 2008 Filing 146 Minute Entry: Status Conference held with Magistrate Judge Laporte on 1/15/2008. (FTR 3:44pm - 3:56pm) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2008)
January 8, 2008 Filing 144 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DATES for Responding to Plaintiffs' Focus Topics re #142 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/19/07. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2007)
December 18, 2007 Filing 142 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Dates for Responding to Plaintiffs' Focus Topics by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 12/18/2007)
December 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #139 Stipulation filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 4, 2007. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2007)
December 3, 2007 Filing 139 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Date for Responding to Plaintiffs' Focus Topics by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
December 3, 2007 Filing 138 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #139 . *** STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Date for Responding to Plaintiffs' Focus Topics by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 12/3/2007) Modified on 12/4/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2007 Filing 141 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Held on 11/13/2007 before Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte - [Court Reporter: James Yeomans]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2007)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re #136 Stipulation, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox Further Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2008 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/29/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 29, 2007 Filing 136 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 28, 2007 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference condcuted on 11/28/07 by HAH. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re Pending Discovery Motions by Judge Laporte denying #96 Motion ; denying #97 Motion to Compel; denying #103 Motion to Compel; granting Defendants' Motion to Compel further definition of focus topics (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 13, 2007 Filing 135 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 11/13/2007 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Focus Topics #96 , Motions to Compel #97 #103 , Defendants' Motion to Compel Further Definition of Discovery Focus Topics #111 . Status Conference set for 1/15/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans/Connie Kuhl) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2007)
November 2, 2007 Filing 133 Declaration of Nicole A. Diller in Support of #131 Reply re Motion of Defendants to Compel Further Definition of Discovery Focus Topics filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 11/2/2007) Modified on 11/5/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2007 Filing 132 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #133 . *** Declaration of Nicole A. Diller in Support of Reply re Motion of Defendants to Compel Further Definition of Discovery Focus Topics filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 11/2/2007) Modified on 11/5/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2007 Filing 131 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Further Definition of Focus Topics filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 11/2/2007) Modified on 11/5/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2007 Filing 127 Declaration of Jamie L. Dupree in Support of #125 Reply Memorandum, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #125 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 30, 2007 Filing 126 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #125 Reply Memorandum, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EE#2 Exhibit FF#3 Exhibit GG#4 Exhibit HH#5 Exhibit II)(Related document(s) #125 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 30, 2007 Filing 125 Reply Memorandum Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 30, 2007 Filing 124 Declaration of Jamie L. Dupree in Support of #122 Reply Memorandum, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #122 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 30, 2007 Filing 123 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #122 Reply Memorandum, filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #122 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 30, 2007 Filing 122 Reply Memorandum Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Focus Topics and To Clarify Time Frame for Discovery and Opposition to Motion of Defendants To Compel Further Definition of Discovery Focus Topics filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER TO SEAL DOCUMENTS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL re #90 Notice (Other) filed by Salvador Aquino, Zoltan Incze, Beverly Kanawi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 29, 2007. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 29, 2007 Filing 120 Proposed Order TO SEAL DOCUMENTS DESIGNATED BY DEFENDANTS AS CONFIDENTIAL RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONFIRM FOCUS TOPICS AND TO CLARIFY TIME FRAME FOR DISCOVERY by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 29, 2007 Filing 119 Declaration of D. Ward Kallstrom IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL RE MOTION TO CONFIRM FOCUS TOPICS AND TO CLARIFY TIME FRAME FOR DISCOVERY filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER ADVANCING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 26, 2007. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2007)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #100 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #106 Motion to Seal Document (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2007)
October 23, 2007 Filing 116 Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Motion of Defendants to Compel Further Definition of Focus Topics by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 10/23/2007)
October 23, 2007 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Ahearn In Support of #114 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 10/23/2007) Modified on 10/24/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2007 Filing 114 Memorandum in Opposition To #97 , #103 Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 10/23/2007) Modified on 10/24/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2007 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Nicole A. Diller In Support of Motion of Defendants to Compel Further Definition of Discovery Focus Topics or, in the Alternative, that the Parties Shall Share Costs of Production and In Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 10/23/2007)
October 23, 2007 Filing 112 DECLARATION of D. Ward Kallstrom In Support of Motion of Defendants to Compel further Definition of Discovery Focus Topics and in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 10/23/2007)
October 23, 2007 Filing 111 Motion to Compel Further Definition of Discovery Focus Topics ; Memorandum in Opposition to #96 Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Focus Topics and to Clarify Time Frame for Discovery, and Motion of Defendants to Compel Further Definition of Discovery Focus Topics filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 10/23/2007) Modified on 10/24/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2007 Filing 110 Proposed Order Sealing Confidential Documents re #106 by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 10/23/2007) Modified on 10/24/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2007 Filing 109 Declaration of D. Ward Kallstrom In Support of #106 Plaintiffs' Administrative Applications to File Documents Under Seal filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 10/23/2007) Modified on 10/24/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2007 Filing 130 EXHIBITS G,H,J,K,L,M,N,O,P,R,U and Attachment to Exhibit Z re #103 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendants, #97 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #103 , #97 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 129 EXHIBITS F,H,I,J,O,P,Q,R,S,T,U,V and attachment to Exhibit DD re #97 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) #97 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 108 Proposed Order re #106 MOTION to Seal Document #104 Declaration in Support, Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007) Modified on 10/10/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2007 Filing 107 Declaration of Jamie L. Dupree in Support of #106 MOTION to Seal Document #104 Declaration in Support, Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #106 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007) Modified on 10/10/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2007 Filing 106 MOTION to Seal Document #104 Declaration in Support, Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 105 Proposed Order re #103 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendants by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 104 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #103 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendants filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to E#2 Exhibits F to P#3 Exhibits Q to S#4 Exhibits T to Z)(Related document(s) #103 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 103 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendants filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 102 Proposed Order re #100 MOTION to Seal Document #98 Declaration in Support, Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production Directe MOTION to Seal Document #98 Declaration in Support, Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production Directe by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 101 Declaration of Jamie L. Dupree in Support of #100 MOTION to Seal Document #98 Declaration in Support, Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production Directe MOTION to Seal Document #98 Declaration in Support, Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production Directe filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #100 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 100 MOTION to Seal Document #98 Declaration in Support, Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File Under Seal related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production Directed to Defendants filed October 9, 2007 filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 99 Proposed Order re #97 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 98 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of #97 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to D#2 Exhibits E to F#3 Exhibits G to L#4 Exhibits M to V#5 Exhibits W to DD)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 97 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 2, 2007 Filing 96 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Focus Topics and to Clarify Time Frame for Discovery re #95 Proposed Order, #94 Declaration in Support, #93 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Focus Topics and to Clarify Time Frame for Discovery filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
October 1, 2007 Filing 128 EXHIBITS H, I and K filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
October 1, 2007 Filing 95 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Focus Topics and to Clarify Time Frame for Discovery by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/1/2007) Modified on 10/2/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2007 Filing 94 Declaration of Heather Lea in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Focus Topics and to Clarify Time Frame for Discovery filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to C#2 Exhibit D#3 Exhibits E-G#4 Exhibits H-I#5 Exhibit J - Part 1#6 Exhibit J - Part 2#7 Exhibit K#8 Exhibit L#9 Exhibits M to P)(Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
October 1, 2007 Filing 93 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Focus Topics and to Clarify Time Frame for Discovery (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
October 1, 2007 Filing 92 Proposed Order to Seal Documents Designated by Defendants as Confidential by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
October 1, 2007 Filing 91 Declaration in Support of #90 Notice (Other) Declaration of Jamie L. Dupree in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for An Order to File Under Seal filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #90 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
October 1, 2007 Filing 90 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino Plaintiffs' Administrative Application for an Order to File under Seal (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying without prejudice #21 Motion to Certify Class. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 24, 2007 Filing 88 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference (Date Filed: 8/24/2007), Motion Hearing (Date Filed: 8/24/2007) re #21 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion, Motion for Class Certification; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Salvador Aquino, Zoltan Incze, Beverly Kanawi. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2007 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2007)
August 21, 2007 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 8/21/07 by HAH. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007)
August 20, 2007 Filing 87 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 17, 2007 Filing 86 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 8/17/2007)
June 28, 2007 Filing 85 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino Supplemental Authority in Support of #21 Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Lea, Heather) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Modified on 6/29/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2007 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled for 6/15/07 has been reset to 8/21/07 at 10:30 a.m. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2007)
June 14, 2007 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 6/15/07 at 2:30 p.m. has been taken off calendar and will be rescheduled. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2007)
June 13, 2007 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 2:30 pm on 6/15/07. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2007)
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #83 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on June 1, 2007. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
May 30, 2007 Filing 83 JOINT INITIAL DISCOVERY PLAN AND PROPOSED ORDER by D. Ward Kallstrom on behalf of Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 5/30/2007) Modified on 5/31/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2007 Filing 82 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/29/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 25, 2007 Filing 80 STIPULATION RE [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 16, 2007 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/07 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Columbini. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2007)
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #58 Motion to Dismiss, deferring ruling on #21 Motion to Certify Class. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2007)
May 11, 2007 Filing 77 NOTICE by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino of Withdrawal of One of Plaintiffs' Attorneys (Perry, Mary) (Filed on 5/11/2007)
May 10, 2007 Filing 76 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 5/10/2007 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. (FTR 2:12pm - 3:00pm) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2007)
May 4, 2007 Filing 75 Joint Discovery Conference Statement and [Proposed] Order filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 5/4/2007) Modified on 5/7/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES - Parties shall file a joint discovery conference statement, no later than 5/3/2007, if any discovery disputes remain after the parties' meet and confer session. Discovery Conference is set for 5/10/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/27/07. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 30, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Discovery (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 27, 2007 Filing 73 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/27/2007 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 4/27/2007), Motion Hearing held on 4/27/2007 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 4/27/2007) re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bechtel Corporation,, Peggi Knox,, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The,, #21 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion, Motion for Class Certification; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Beverly Kanawi,, Zoltan Incze,, Salvador Aquino,. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2007 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2007)
April 27, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Discovery (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007)
April 26, 2007 Filing 72 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Defendants' Initial Discovery Plan, Further Case Management Conference Statement and [Proposed] Order filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 25, 2007 Filing 71 NOTICE by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The of Supplementary Material in Support of #58 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 4/25/2007) Modified on 4/27/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2007 Filing 70 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Proposed Initial Discovery Plan, Further Case Management Conference Statement and [Proposed] Order filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 20, 2007 Filing 69 Reply to Opposition to #58 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 4/20/2007) Modified on 4/24/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2007 Filing 68 Appendix re #67 Memorandum in Opposition Appendix of Other Cited Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1#2 Exhibit A - Part 2#3 Exhibit A - Part 3#4 Exhibit B#5 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 13, 2007 Filing 67 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to #58 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/13/2007) Modified on 4/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #62 Ex Parte Application (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2007)
April 10, 2007 Filing 65 Statement of Non-Opposition to #62 Plaintiffs' April 10, 2007 Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Brief Not More Than Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Fifteen Page Limit filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Sullivan, Andrew) (Filed on 4/10/2007) Modified on 4/11/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2007 Filing 64 Proposed Order Granting #62 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Brief Not More Than Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Fifteen Page Limit by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/10/2007) Modified on 4/11/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2007 Filing 63 Declaration of Jamie L. Dupree in Support of #62 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application For Leave to File a Brief Not More Than Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Fifteen Page Limit filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/10/2007) Modified on 4/11/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2007 Filing 62 Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Brief Not More Than Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Fifteen Page Limit filed by Beverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
April 6, 2007 Filing 61 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plainitffs' Second Amended Complaint by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 4/6/2007)
April 6, 2007 Filing 60 Appendix of Other Cited Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C, Part 1#4 Exhibit C, Part 2#5 Exhibit C, Part 3#6 Exhibit D#7 Exhibit E#8 Exhibit F)(Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 4/6/2007)
April 6, 2007 Filing 59 Declaration of Peggi S. Knox in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed byBechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1#2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 2#3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 4/6/2007)
April 6, 2007 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 4/6/2007)
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #56 Ex Parte Application (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 3, 2007 Filing 56 Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Brief Not More than Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Fifteen Page Limit filed by Bechtel Corporation, Peggi Knox, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The, Pat Damsgaard. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew C. Sullivan in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Brief Not More than Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Fifteen Page Limit#2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Brief Not More than Five Pages in Excess of the Court's Fifteen Page Limit)(Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
March 23, 2007 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint Demand for Jury Trial Class Action against Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. Filed byBeverly Kanawi, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 3/23/2007) Modified on 3/27/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2007. Motions due by 4/6/2007. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
March 22, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion, Motion for Class Certification; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2007 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
March 22, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2007 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
March 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #31 Motion to Amend/Correct; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document not later than Wednesday, March 28, 2007; and terminating #18 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 7, 2007 Filing 53 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Demand for a Jury Trial filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 3/7/2007)
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re #51 Stipulation, filed by Bechtel Corporation,, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The,, Peggi Knox,, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #51 Stipulation,, #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty and to Strike Plaintiffs' Demand for a Jury Trial and Defective Allegations of Fraudulent Concealment, #21 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion, Motion for Class Certification; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/05/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2007 10:00 AM. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 2, 2007 Filing 51 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Hearings on (1) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and to Strike Plaintiffs' Jury Demand and (2) Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
February 28, 2007 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2007 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2007) Modified on 3/2/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #39 Stipulation, filed by Beverly Kanawi,, Zoltan Incze,, Salvador Aquino,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/26/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2007)
February 26, 2007 Filing 48 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Demand for a Jury Trial filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT , Revised Discovery Plan and [Proposed] Order filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Filing 46 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Initial Discovery Plan and [Proposed] Order by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Filing 45 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Further Case Management Conference Statement and [Proposed] Order filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 20, 2007 Filing 44 Reply to Opposition Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of #21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 2/20/2007) Modified on 2/22/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2007 Filing 43 Proposed Order Granting #21 Class Certification by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 2/20/2007) Modified on 2/22/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2007 Filing 42 Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of #21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E#2 Exhibit F#3 Exhibit G)(Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 2/20/2007) Modified on 2/22/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2007 Filing 41 Reply Memorandum In Support of #18 Motion to Dismiss filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 2/16/2007) Modified on 2/21/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2007 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal Dismissing This Action Against Defendant Damsgaard Without Prejudice by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Pat Damsguard. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 2/15/2007)
February 15, 2007 Filing 39 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Permitting Filing of Reply Papers in Support of Motion for Class Certification on Tuesday, February 20, 2007 Due to Unavailability of Electronic Filing (PACER) System After 5 p.m. on Friday, February 16, 2007 by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 2/15/2007)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #33 Stipulation, filed by Bechtel Corporation,, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The,, Peggi Knox,, Pat Damsguard,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/12/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
February 9, 2007 Filing 37 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #21 by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Pat Damsguard. (Sullivan, Andrew) (Filed on 2/9/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2007 Filing 36 Declaration of D. Ward Kallstrom in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Pat Damsguard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Sullivan, Andrew) (Filed on 2/9/2007)
February 9, 2007 Filing 35 Memorandum in Opposition to #21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Pat Damsguard. (Sullivan, Andrew) (Filed on 2/9/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2007 Filing 34 Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' January 25, 2007 Motion to Amend to Correct Editing Error in Count I of Complaint #31 filed byBechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Pat Damsguard. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/9/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2007 Filing 33 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Deeming Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint to be a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Pat Damsguard. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 2/9/2007)
January 25, 2007 Filing 32 Declaration of Daniel V. Conlisk in Support of #31 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO CORRECT EDITING ERROR IN COUNT I OF COMPLAINT filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Related document(s) #31 ) (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 25, 2007 Filing 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO CORRECT EDITING ERROR IN COUNT I OF COMPLAINT filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 19, 2007 Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE AND CROSS-MOTION TO AMEND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT TYPOGRAPHICAL ERRORS filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 1/19/2007)
January 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #28 Stipulation, filed by Bechtel Corporation,, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The,, Peggi Knox,, Pat Damsguard, Further Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2007 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/12/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2007)
January 12, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty and to Strike Plaintiffs' Demand for a Jury Trial and Defective Allegations of Fraudulent Concealment. Responses to Mtn to Dismiss due by 1/19/2007. Replies to Mtn to Dismiss due by 2/16/2007. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2007)
January 12, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion, Motion for Class Certification; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Responses to Mtn for Class Certification due by 2/9/2007. Replies to Mtn for Class Certification due by 2/16/2007. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2007)
January 11, 2007 Filing 28 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Deposition, Further Case Management Conference, and Hearings on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and and Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Pat Damsguard. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 1/11/2007)
January 9, 2007 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Named Class Representative Zoltan Incze by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Lea, Heather) (Filed on 1/9/2007)
January 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #25 Stipulation, filed by Bechtel Corporation,, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The,, Peggi Knox,, Pat Damsguard,, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #25 Stipulation,, #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty and to Strike Plaintiffs' Demand for a Jury Trial and Defective Allegations of Fraudulent Concealment, #21 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion, Motion for Class Certification; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Responses due by 1/12/2007. Replies due by 2/2/2007. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2007 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/03/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
December 29, 2006 Filing 25 STIPULATION re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty and to Strike Plaintiffs' Demand for a Jury Trial and Defective Allegations of Fraudulent Concealment and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Pat Damsguard. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 12/29/2006)
December 15, 2006 Filing 24 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2006 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 12/15/2006 12/15/2006). Further Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2007 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2006)
December 15, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion, Motion for Class Certification; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 14, 2006 Filing 23 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C#2 Exhibit D)(Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 12/14/2006)
December 14, 2006 Filing 22 Declaration of Jerome S. Schlichter Declaration of Jerome S. Schlichter in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 12/14/2006)
December 14, 2006 Filing 21 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion, Motion for Class Certification; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 12/14/2006)
December 14, 2006 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted by HAH on 12/14/2006. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for June 15, 2007 at 9:00 a.m.(af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2006).
December 12, 2006 Filing 20 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kallstrom, D.) (Filed on 12/12/2006)
December 12, 2006 Filing 19 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, December 14, 2006 at 2:30 p.m., PST. Please take note that Plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties, then calls the ADR Office at (415) 522-4603. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2006)
December 11, 2006 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty and to Strike Plaintiffs' Demand for a Jury Trial and Defective Allegations of Fraudulent Concealment filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Pat Damsguard. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Peggi S. Knox in Support of Defendants' Motion#2 Exhibit A to Knox Declaration#3 Exhibit B to Knox Declaration#4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Strike)(Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 12/11/2006)
December 8, 2006 Filing 17 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The, Peggi Knox, Pat Damsguard. (Attachments: #1)(Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 12/8/2006)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2006)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2006)
November 21, 2006 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Daniel V. Conlisk filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
November 21, 2006 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Heather Lea filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
November 21, 2006 Received Order re 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Heather Lea by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2006 Received Order re 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Daniel V. Conlisk by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 20, 2006 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie L. Dupree (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 11/20/2006)
November 9, 2006 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT Certificate of Service re #2 and Judge Breyer's Standing Orders by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Perry, Mary) (Filed on 11/9/2006) Modified on 11/14/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2006 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Perry, Mary) (Filed on 11/9/2006)
November 9, 2006 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Additional Materials served on Pat Damsguaad on 10-17-06, filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Perry, Mary) (Filed on 11/9/2006)
November 9, 2006 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Additional Materials served on Peggi Knox on 10-17-06, filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Perry, Mary) (Filed on 11/9/2006)
November 9, 2006 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Addtional Materials served on Bechtel Corporation on 9-20-06, filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Perry, Mary) (Filed on 11/9/2006)
November 9, 2006 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint & Additional Materials served on Becktell Trust & Thrift Plan Committee on 10-17-06, filed by Beverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (Perry, Mary) (Filed on 11/9/2006)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #4 Ex Parte Application (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2006)
October 6, 2006 Filing 4 Ex Parte Application for Additional Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty filed by Bechtel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Donald P. Sullivan in Support of Bechtel's Ex Parte Application for Additional Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 10/6/2006)
September 28, 2006 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2006)
September 11, 2006 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2006. Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2006 08:30 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 3389880.) SUMMONS ISSUED. Filed byBeverly Kanawi, Zoltan Incze, Salvador Aquino. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (Filed on 9/11/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanawi et al v. Bechtel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoltan Incze
Represented By: Mary L. Perry
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Daniel V Conlisk,
Represented By: Jerry J. Schlichter
Represented By: Heather Lea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Kanawi
Represented By: Mary L. Perry
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Matthew Armstrong
Represented By: Daniel V Conlisk,
Represented By: Martin H. Dodd
Represented By: Mark George Boyko
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Jason P. Kelly
Represented By: Heather Lea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Aquino
Represented By: Mary L. Perry
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Matthew Armstrong
Represented By: Daniel V Conlisk,
Represented By: Martin H. Dodd
Represented By: Mark George Boyko
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Jason P. Kelly
Represented By: Heather Lea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Administrative Committee, The
Represented By: William James Taylor
Represented By: Molly Moriarty Lane
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Represented By: Christopher M. Ahearn
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Stephen Bradley Perkins
Represented By: D. Ward Kallstrom
Represented By: Andrew Cameron Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont Investment Advisors
Represented By: Marc A. Centor
Represented By: Tammy Lee Kissman
Represented By: Grace A. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Corporation
Represented By: Amy M. Spicer
Represented By: Jami Wintz McKeon
Represented By: William James Taylor
Represented By: Molly Moriarty Lane
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Represented By: Nicole A. Diller
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Represented By: Christopher M. Ahearn
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Stephen Bradley Perkins
Represented By: D. Ward Kallstrom
Represented By: Andrew Cameron Sullivan
Represented By: Ellen L Perlioni
Represented By: Franklin Brockway Gowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Damsguard
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: D. Ward Kallstrom
Represented By: Andrew Cameron Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Damsgaard
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Trust and Thrift Plan Committee, The
Represented By: D. Ward Kallstrom
Represented By: Amy M. Spicer
Represented By: Jami Wintz McKeon
Represented By: William James Taylor
Represented By: Molly Moriarty Lane
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Represented By: Nicole A. Diller
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Represented By: Christopher M. Ahearn
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Stephen Bradley Perkins
Represented By: Ellen L Perlioni
Represented By: Franklin Brockway Gowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggi Knox
Represented By: Amy M. Spicer
Represented By: Jami Wintz McKeon
Represented By: William James Taylor
Represented By: Molly Moriarty Lane
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Represented By: Nicole A. Diller
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Represented By: Christopher M. Ahearn
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Stephen Bradley Perkins
Represented By: D. Ward Kallstrom
Represented By: Andrew Cameron Sullivan
Represented By: Ellen L Perlioni
Represented By: Franklin Brockway Gowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Secretary of Labor Hilda L. Solis
Represented By: Robert L Furst
Represented By: Elizabeth Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?