Bridgestone Americas Holding Inc et al v. Chemtura Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv05700
Filed: September 19, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2009 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT JAMES J. CONWAY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 4, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 23, 2008 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO SUBMIT TO ARBITRATION; SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Federal court proceedings are stayed pending completion of arbitration. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than March 20, 2009, and every six months thereafter. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 23, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 15, 2008 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference is continued from September 19, 2008 to October 3, 2008. A Joint Status Statement shall be filed no later than September 26, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgestone Americas Holding Inc et al v. Chemtura Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?