Curiel et al v. The County of Contra Costa et al
Case Number: 3:2006cv05751
Filed: September 19, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 21, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING ATTENDANCE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE re 83 Letter filed by Kimberly Marie Curiel, Frederick Michael Curiel. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/16/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Mediation/Settlement. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/31/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 75 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
September 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 4 ADR Scheduling Order (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2006)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curiel et al v. The County of Contra Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?