Williams v. Malfi

Case Number: 3:2006cv05825
Filed: September 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re Case Nos. 15-cv-3013, 04-cv-0117, 09-cv-3194. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 27, 2015. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
January 14, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 14, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 13, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 41 MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 13, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
August 25, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Anthony J. Malfi against Charles Lee Williams. The petition for a writ of habeas corpus is hereby DENIED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
September 10, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 26 FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Malfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?