United States of America v. Beary et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv05838
Filed: September 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2010 200 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS HELD IN REGISTRY OF COURT AND FOR DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/5/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 3, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/3/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 1, 2010 193 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 191 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/1/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 8, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 184 Proposed Order filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/8/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
December 8, 2009 183 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 182 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/8/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
September 25, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 178 Proposed Order filed by Lois Rust. Signed by Judge Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 9/25/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 24, 2009 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 174 Proposed Order filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 9/24/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 19, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 168 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/19/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 12, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 165 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/12/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
March 23, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Rescheduling Further Settlement Conference for 7/8/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/23/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
January 16, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 157 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/16/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
November 12, 2008 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Settlement Conference Rescheduled for 12/10/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by HON. MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/10/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
October 6, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Settlement Conference set for 11/12/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/6/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 9, 2008 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/9/2008. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
February 1, 2008 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 142 Motion to Substitute Party (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Beary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?