Baxter et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06081
Filed: September 28, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Jack L. King terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/22/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 28, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Vera Beaver, Curtis P. Beitz, John S. Berkley, Donald Billingsley, Emma Bingham, Linda L. Bowers, Lynette Broughton, Katie May Brown, James Callaway, Willie E. Crane, Dewie M. Creason, Larry Eison, Floyd Fleeger, Jr, James L. Fuller, Earl P. Garcia, Ronald M. Gartman, Porifiria Gonzalez, Virginia L. Gordon, Teresa A. Gossett, Leesa Graff, Richard Allan Grinnen, Harvey Hamblin, Sr, Joseph Hammerbacher, Geraldine Heesch, Frank Henderson, Jr, Gerald L. Hoppe, Linda J. Hyde, Bobby Johnson, Martha Nell Johnson, James Kempen, Vickie E. King, Timothy Baxter and Flora M. Beard terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 11, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Mary Hicks terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
May 5, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; David Eaker terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/30/09. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?