Martin v. City of Richmond

Case Number: 3:2006cv06146
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re 105 Stipulation filed by Kevin Martin. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/9/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
January 27, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (60 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/20/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 5, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating January 12, 2010 Mandatory Settlement Conference re 99 Stipulation filed by City of Richmond. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/04/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
October 22, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to vacate deadlines scheduled in this matter due to pending settlement discussions re 97 Stipulation filed by Kevin Martin. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/22/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 21, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to modify re 94 Stipulation filed by City of Richmond Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 11/20/2009.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/21/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
May 22, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing deadline for parties to stipulate to conditional collective action certification re 81 Stipulation filed by City of Richmond. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/21/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
March 2, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Parties shall meet and confer by 3/16/9. Jt case management report with results of the meet and confer due by 3/27/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/02/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?