Daniels v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06348
Filed: October 11, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (NINETY-DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL); Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/12/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
January 22, 2010 184 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Further Case Management Conference continued to 5/24/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/21/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 8, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/7/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 3, 2008 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/2/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
October 30, 2008 133 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/29/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 29, 2008 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion to Continue (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
September 24, 2008 118 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/24/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 10, 2008 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/9/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 9, 2008 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/9/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?