OakPAC et al v. The City of Oakland et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06366
Filed: October 11, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED JUDGMENT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 6, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
February 12, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING TIME FOR OPENING BRIEFS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
October 31, 2006 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Stipulation, filed by Michael Colbruno,, OakPAC,, Oakland Metropolitan Chamber of Commerce,, Oakland Metropolitan Chamber of Commerce Independent Expenditure Committee (Oak-IE-PAC),, Scott B. Peterson, Status Conference set for 12/12/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/31/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2006)
October 24, 2006 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/1/2006 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 10/27/2006.Reply due by 10/30/2006.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/24/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2006)
October 19, 2006 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/19/2006. (mjjlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2006)
October 12, 2006 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Response to Application for a TRO. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/12/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OakPAC et al v. The City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?