Pierson v. Scott et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06503
Filed: October 18, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2011 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR RELEASE OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND FOR STAY OF EXECUTION re 324 Stipulation filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/12/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
March 26, 2010 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TAXING COSTS. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/26/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
February 2, 2010 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 298 Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
October 23, 2009 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 271 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 274 Motion for New Trial (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
August 26, 2009 268 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY JUDGMENT re 267 Stipulation filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/26/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 18, 2009 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 253 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting 254 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 255 Motion to Alter Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
April 16, 2009 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 193 Motion in Limine (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
October 3, 2008 178 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/1/2008. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierson v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?