Jefferson v. Chase Home Finance LLC

Case Number: 3:2006cv06510
Filed: October 18, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Referring Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 197 Motion for Attorney Fees. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
April 24, 2009 225 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding corrected final approval order. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/23/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
October 27, 2008 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/27/08. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
September 29, 2008 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 9/29/08. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. Chase Home Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?