S.H. et al v. West Contra Costa County Unified School District Financing Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06655
Filed: October 26, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/15/2009 GRANTING Plaintiff's Petition to Compromise of Minor's Claims. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
March 3, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/02/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
December 11, 2008 102 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 2/6/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/11/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
September 15, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing party Gloria Johnston. Gloria Johnston terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/15/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 4, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Allowing Telephonic Appearance At Case Management Conference, Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on September 4, 2008. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.H. et al v. West Contra Costa County Unified School District Financing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?