Howard v. Gap, Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv06773
Filed: October 31, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS AND DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 1, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 10, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [re 99 Notice (Other) filed by Gap, Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/10/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 8, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND VACATING 11/12/2009 HEARING [re 81 MOTION to Compel filed by Dienna Howard]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/8/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
August 5, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
April 2, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 54 Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/2/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 1, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 53 USCA Memorandum]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/1/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
October 31, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Gap, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?