Cervenka et al v. General Electric Company

Case Number: 3:2006cv06949
Filed: November 7, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Voluntary Dismissal OF ENTIRE ACTION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/25/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 1, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC AND PLAINTIFFS REGARDING STATUS OF SETTLEMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/1/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
September 25, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/25/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 5, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 9/28/2012.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 13, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (MDL 875) by MDL Panel remanding case back to the USDC Northern District-San Francisco; Case reopened. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cervenka et al v. General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?