MMCA Group Ltd. v. Hewlett-Packard Company et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07067
Filed: November 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2010 959 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's claims alleged against defendant PICA Corporation are dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within thirty (30) days, that the agreed consideration fo r the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 14, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
June 15, 2010 948 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PICA'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE EXHIBITS A AND B UNDER SEAL. Defendant is directed to file the documents under seal pursuant to General Order No. 62. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 15, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 26, 2010 945 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT PICA CORPORATION. Gregory H. Melick withdrawing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 26, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 25, 2010 943 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SEALING PLAINTIFF MMCA'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLMENT WITH PICA. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 25, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 19, 2010 936 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PICA CORPORATION AND PLAINTIFF MMCA GROUP LTD's JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL FOR THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FRIDAY APRIL 30, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 19, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 13, 2010 934 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
April 28, 2010 927 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PICA CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION FOR ITS PRO HAC VICE CO-COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Defendant PICA's pro hac vice co-counsel, Gregory H. Melick, and Plaintiff MMCA's counsel shall appear by telephone on April 30, 2010 at the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 20, 2010 925 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING IN PART ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
March 26, 2010 921 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 10, 2010 920 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING FEBRUARY 17, 2010 ORDER [DOC. 858] TO GRANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE EXHIBITS M AND O UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 10, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 2, 2010 888 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SEALING IN PART MMCA'S OPPOSITIONS TO HP'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-4 & 6-8 AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 2, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 1, 2010 883 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SEALING MATERIAL IN HP'S PRETRIAL FILINGS; DIRECTIONS TO HP. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 1, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 24, 2010 874 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO ALLOW EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 24, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 19, 2010 870 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL REPLY [DOC. NO. 797]; DIRECTIONS TO HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY TO FILE IN PUBLIC RECORD REDACTED VERSION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 17, 2010 858 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFERRED PORTION OF HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL [DOC. 737]; DIRECTIONS TO HEWLETT PACKARD. Hewlett-Packard is directed to file in the public record, no l ater than February 24, 2010, redacted versions of the motion to exclude, the Declaration of Robert Cozzolina, and the Declaration of Samuel Liversidge. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 17, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 16, 2010 852 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SEALING MMCA'S CORRECTED EXHIBITS L AND M ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF ERRATA AND DECLARATION OF KENNETH FRUCHT; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Plaintiff shall file in the public record, no later than February 24, 2010, redacted versions of the Corrected Exhibits L and M. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 16, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 12, 2010 846 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART HP'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF MMCA GROUP LTD'S DAMAGES EXPERT, RANDY SUGARMAN. Filed February 12, 2010 by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 10, 2010 840 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 9, 2010 839 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 766 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR LIMITED RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 9, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 2, 2010 795 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 2, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 1, 2010 757 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. The Court will afford MMCA, PICA, and Pinkerton the opportunity to file, no later than February 8, 2010, a declaration or declarations in response to the administrative motion. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 21, 2010 747 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2010. The hearing on HP's Motion to Exclude shall be placed on calendar for February 12, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. The dates on which the opposition and reply are due remain as though the matter were to be heard on February 19, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 12, 2010 732 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 346 HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 384 PICA CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 5, 2010 707 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE PORTIONS OF ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Plaintiff is directed to refile in the public record, no later than January 15, 2010, the portions of Attachment 1 to Document No. 616 properly filed in the public record. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 17, 2009 699 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 694 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice By R. Mark Halligan ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611039990.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice By R. Mark Halligan ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611039990.) filed by MMCA Group Ltd., Attorney R. Mark Halligan for MMCA Group Ltd. added.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/17/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 16, 2009 696 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SEALING DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S "MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO MODIFY PRETRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DAUBERT MOTION." Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 4, 2009 684 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON BRIEFING AND HEARING OF DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DAUBERT MOTION. The deadline for filing opposition to HP 9;s motion to continue is December 8, 2009. The deadline for filing reply is December 10, 2009 at 10:00 a.m., with chambers copies due by noon on the same day. The hearing is set for December 11, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
November 18, 2009 663 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motions, the Court deems the matters suitable for decision thereon, and vacates the hearing scheduled for November 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 2, 2009 629 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 585 603 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena to Rocio Cvar; and Vacating Hearing. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
September 24, 2009 592 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 591 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Defendant PICA Corporation's Pro Hac Vice Co-Counsel, Gregory H. Melick, may appear by telephone for the September 25, 2009 Further Status Conference. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 24, 2009 582 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (BY TELEPHONE). The parties are ordered to appear for a Case Management Conference on August 28, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. All counsel are directed to appear by telephone. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 4, 2009 577 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 20, 2009 569 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PICA CORPORATION'S OBJECTION TO ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 15, 2009 568 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON PICA CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. MMCA's opposition shall be filed no later than July 22, 2009, and PICA's reply shall be filed no later than July 27, 2009. The motion will stand submitted on the date PICA's reply is due and will be decided without a hearing, unless the Court hereafter determines a hearing is necessary. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 15, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
June 17, 2009 545 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Gregory H. Melnick is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 17, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 15, 2009 544 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/15/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
May 29, 2009 527 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT. The Clerk shall prohibit public access to Docket Number 514. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 29, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 18, 2009 519 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT PICA. Matthew R. Planey is allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for defendant PICA. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 7, 2009 511 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT PICA CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
April 28, 2009 503 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT PICA CORPORATION. Any opposition shall be filed by May 1, 2009. If no opposition is filed, the matter will stand submitted on that date. If opposition is filed, any reply shall be filed by May 4, 2009, after which date the application will stand submitted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 21, 2009 497 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. Thomas Marc Litton is allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 21, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 7, 2009 495 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 493 Joint Letter of April 6, 2009, and 494 Defendant PICA's Letter of April 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/2009. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
March 31, 2009 492 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 491 Joint Letter of March 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/31/2009. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 10, 2009 489 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANT PICA CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AND TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE DECLARATION OF VINCE VOLPI. The motion is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 5, 2009 486 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 483 Joint Letter of February 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/2009. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 24, 2009 475 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 27, 2009 HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 24, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 20, 2009 471 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING RENEWED MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 20, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 18, 2009 460 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANT PICA CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. The motion is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 9, 2009 445 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. If plaintiff wishes the Court to consider any document referenced in paragraph 2 or paragraph 3, plaintiff shall file such document in th e public record no later than February 13, 2009. If plaintiff wishes the Court to consider any document referenced in paragraph 4 or paragraph 5, plaintiff, no later than February 13, 2009, shall either file such document in the public record or file a renewed administrative motion to seal accompanied by a declaration establishing such document is sealable. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 9, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 21, 2009 412 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 15, 2009 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS FOUND TO BE SEALABLE; DIRECTING PICA TO FILE IN PUBLIC RECORD DOCUMENTS NOT FOUND TO BE SEALABLE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 15, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 6, 2009 396 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CHANGING DEADLINES. Plaintiff's opposition to PICA's Motion for Summary Judgment / Partial Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than January 23, 2009, and defendant's reply shall be filed no later than Jan uary 30, 2009. In light of the Court's calendar, the hearing on the motion shall be on February 20, 2009. Additionally, the hearing on HP's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Judgment on the Pleadings is continued to February 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 29, 2008 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. With respect to the documents referenced in paragraphs 2 and 4 of this order, PICA may file, no later than January 5, 2009, a declaration establishing said documents are sealable. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 29, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 19, 2008 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SEALING MATERIAL IN HP'S REPLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 19, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 16, 2008 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. If plaintiff wishes the Court to consider any documents not found to be sealable, plaintiff shall file such documents in the public record no later than December 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 10, 2008 363 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING DEADLINES. The deadline for HP's reply is extended to December 15, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 26, 2008 357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT/JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS; CONTINUING HEARING. Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed no later than December 3, 2008. HP's reply shall be filed no later than December 10, 2008. The hearing is continued to January 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 24, 2008 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FOUND TO BE SEALABLE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 14, 2008 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
September 23, 2008 345 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES. The dispositive motions filing cutoff is continued to July 24, 2009; the pretrial conference is continued to September 29, 2009; the jury trial is continued to October 19, 2009. The deadlines to complete discovery are continued as set forth in the parties' stipulation filed September 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 23, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 16, 2008 342 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BUSINESS RISKS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (U.K.)'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 15, 2008 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MMCA Group Ltd. v. Hewlett-Packard Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?