Doss v. Transocean Shipmanagement GMBA

Case Number: 3:2006cv07072
Filed: November 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TAKING CASE MANANGEMENT CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR re 194 Letter filed by Tonita Doss. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/22/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
February 18, 2011 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING MR. TAMULSKI FROM ATTENDANCE AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 188 Letter filed by John T. Essberger GmbH, Lungi Shipping, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/18/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
January 24, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/24/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
August 10, 2010 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND AMEND PRE-TRIAL ORDER re 143 Stipulation filed by Tonita Doss. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/10/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
June 22, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTEDNING DEADLINES TO DISCLOSE EXPERT WITNESS re 133 Stipulation filed by Tonita Doss. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/21/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 21, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/21/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
April 14, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING PRE-TRIAL ORDER re 71 Stipulation filed by Hyundai Merchant Marine America Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/14/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 4, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 57 Notice (Other) filed by John T. Essberger GmbH, Lungi Shipping, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/4/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
November 12, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 52 Letter filed by Tonita Doss. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
September 15, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 50 Case Management Statement filed by Tonita Doss. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/15/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
June 17, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 48 Stipulation filed by Tonita Doss. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/17/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
January 13, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 40 Case Management Statement filed by Tonita Doss. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/13/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doss v. Transocean Shipmanagement GMBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?