Saucer v. Smit et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07119
Filed: November 16, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 47 Proposed Order filed by G. Smit, Wayne Tucker, City of Oakland, Oakland Police Department. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/25/10. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 24, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Jury Commissioner to Furnish Daily Refreshments Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/24/10. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
December 15, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO FOR TRIAL. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/15/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
November 13, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE TRIAL SCHEDULE re 40 Letter filed by G. Smit, Wayne Tucker, City of Oakland, Oakland Police Department. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/13/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
April 20, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/20/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
March 26, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; ORDER SCHEDULING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/26/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 10, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STATUS REPORT; ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION; ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/10/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 27, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
October 31, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/31/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
September 24, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/24/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saucer v. Smit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?