In re Autodesk, Inc. Derivative Litigation

Case Number: 3:2006cv07185
Filed: November 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/10/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
January 23, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 76 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
December 15, 2008 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 53 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Autodesk, Inc. Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?