Youkhana v. Chertoff et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07191
Filed: November 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/8/2006. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2006)
December 4, 2006 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DATE FOR RESPONDENTS' RESPONSE TO COURT'S NOVEMBER 28, 2006 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 6 Stipulation, filed by Barnes, Nancy Alcantar, Alberto Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, Charles Demore, Julie Myers. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/4/2006. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2006)
November 28, 2006 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 3 Application for Writ filed by Edward Youkhana. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/28/2006. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youkhana v. Chertoff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?