S. et al v. Fremont Unified School District

Case Number: 3:2006cv07218
Filed: November 21, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2009 210 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiff is entered accordingly. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
November 24, 2009 205 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to Replace Exhibits A and B to the District's Requst for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion with Redacted Versions by Fremont Unified School District re 203 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
October 28, 2009 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing motion to 12/2/09 @ 4 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
September 15, 2009 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting leave to file 3rd amended complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. et al v. Fremont Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?