AT&T Communications of California, Inc. et al v. Pac-West Telecomm, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07271
Filed: November 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING REMAND. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
December 7, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER re 100 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Teleport Communications Group of Los Angeles, AT&T Communications of California, Inc., Teleport Communications Group of San Diego, Teleport Communications Group of San Francisco (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
September 19, 2008 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 89 Motion to Stay. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 10, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART 90 Motion to Shorten Time. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Communications of California, Inc. et al v. Pac-West Telecomm, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?