Prakash v. Pulsent Corporation Employee Long Term Disability Plan

Case Number: 3:2006cv07592
Filed: December 12, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2009 394 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/6/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
March 20, 2009 385 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing equipment into the Courtroom (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 11, 2009 345 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PRETRIAL SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/11/09. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 4, 2009 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 285 Motion to Seal (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
February 26, 2009 284 Opinion or Order of the Court FILING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/26/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 12, 2009 273 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/12/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 16, 2009 254 Opinion or Order of the Court Plaintiff's request for leave to file a motion to quash is DENIED. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 14, 2009 253 Opinion or Order of the Court JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/14/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 17, 2008 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 201 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Verseon LLC, 202 Objection filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada dba Sun Life Financial. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/17/08. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 2, 2008 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Objection to Ninth Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/2/08. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prakash v. Pulsent Corporation Employee Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?