Symantec Corporation v. Logical Plus, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07963
Filed: December 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
July 20, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CASE TO BE CLOSED) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
June 4, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT JOSEPH CHANG AND MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS AGAINST JOSEPH CHANG (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
December 1, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING TELEPHONE APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT COUNSEL AND DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/1/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
October 20, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 45 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
September 8, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 63 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANT LOGICAL PLUS, INC., AND TO PARTIALLY LIFT STAY TO PROCEED AGAINST ALL REMAINING SOLVENT DEFENDANTS; SETTING SCHEDULE ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION, hearing set for 10/16/09 9:00 a.m. re 45 . Plaintiff's supplemental brief is due 9/25/09, defendant's opposition is due 10/2/09, plaintiff's reply is due 10/9/09. Case management conference is set for 10/16/09 at 3:00 pm; the parties joint case management conference statement is due 10/9/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
February 4, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Awarding Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 2/4/2008. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symantec Corporation v. Logical Plus, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?