Cessna Employees Credit Union et al v. Lorimac Inc.

Plaintiff: Les Bois Federal Credit Union, Idaho Falls Teachers Credit Union, Health Services Credit Union, East Idaho Credit Union, Advantage Plus Federal Credit Union and Cessna Employees Credit Union
Defendant: Lorimac Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00120
Filed: January 8, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/3/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
January 23, 2007 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/23/07. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2007)
January 16, 2007 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 6 Motion for TRO, denying 7 Motion for TRO, denying 9 Ex Parte Application (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cessna Employees Credit Union et al v. Lorimac Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Bois Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Richard Alan Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Falls Teachers Credit Union
Represented By: Robert C. Gebhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Services Credit Union
Represented By: J.T. Wells Blaxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Idaho Credit Union
Represented By: J.T. Wells Blaxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advantage Plus Federal Credit Union
Represented By: J.T. Wells Blaxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cessna Employees Credit Union
Represented By: J.T. Wells Blaxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorimac Inc.
Represented By: Andrew A. August
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?