Levi Strauss & Co. v. Self Edge et al

Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co.
Defendant: Works, Inc., Samurai Co., Ltd., Studio D'Artisan International Co., LTD., Toyo Enterprise Co., Ltd., Flat Head Co., Ltd., Maruni Nishiwaki Co., Ltd., Full Count Co., Ltd., John Bull Co., Ltd., Warehouse Co., Swagger Co. and Yugen Kaisha Seiaiya
Case Number: 3:2007cv00245
Filed: January 12, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 47 70 71 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting 73 Report and Recommendations as to Motion for Default Judgment. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
September 11, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 47 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Various Defendants filed by Levi Strauss & Co. Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2009. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 09/11/2009. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
July 2, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re 47 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Various Defendants filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 4, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING re 47 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Various Defendants filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/4/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
March 24, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING re 47 MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co. for Entry of Default Judgment Against Various Defendants filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/24/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 23, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT YUGEN KAISHA SEIAIYA. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/23/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 12, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 56 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Flat Head Co., Ltd. filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamiltion on 3/12/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 3, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT WORKS INC. re 52 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Levi Strauss & Co. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/3/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 2, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE & REQUEST FOR STATUS REPORT re 47 MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co. for Entry of Default Judgment Against Various Defendants filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 23, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/23/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 4, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/4/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 23, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2007 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/23/07. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levi Strauss & Co. v. Self Edge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samurai Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Studio D'Artisan International Co., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyo Enterprise Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flat Head Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maruni Nishiwaki Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Full Count Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bull Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warehouse Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swagger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yugen Kaisha Seiaiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co.
Represented By: Timothy R. Cahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?