Hawks v. Kane

Petitioner: Harold Harvey Hawks
Respondent: A. P. Kane and Ben Curry
Case Number: 3:2007cv00366
Filed: January 18, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND DENYING AS MOOT IN PART 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Harold Harvey Hawks. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 22, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
June 30, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING 21 Supplemental Brief filed by Harold Harvey Hawks. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 30, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
May 11, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 11, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawks v. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold Harvey Hawks
Represented By: Steve M. Defilippis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. P. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben Curry
Represented By: Scott Colin Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?