O'Hartz v. California State Automobile Association Inter-Insurance Bureau Group Long Term Disability Plan

Plaintiff: Susan O'Hartz
Defendant: California State Automobile Association Inter-Insurance Bureau Group Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2007cv00415
Filed: January 22, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 25, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 11, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED, and defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby DENIED as follows:1. Plaintiffs STD benefits shall be reinstated effective May 29, 2003, in accordance with the terms of the STD policy.2. Defendant shall evaluate plaintiffs claim for LTD benefits under the terms of the LTD policy.3. To the extent plaintiff seeks to recover attorneys fees under 29 U.S.C. § 1132(g), plaintiff shall file a separate motion pursuant to Civil L.R. 54-6.4. To the extent plaintiff seeks an award of prejudgment interest, plaintiff shall make and support such request in her motion for attorneys fees or by separate motion filed no later than the date on which her motion for attorneys fees is due.5. Any bill of costs shall be filed in accordance with Civil L.R. 54-1. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
September 3, 2008 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 26 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 3, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Hartz v. California State Automobile Association Inter-Insurance Bureau Group Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan O'Hartz
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Automobile Association Inter-Insurance Bureau Group Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Joanne M. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?