Heidinger v. Yates

Plaintiff: Gerald Heidinger
Defendant: James A. Yates and People of the State of California
Case Number: 3:2007cv00429
Filed: January 23, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 60 , 66 , 73 PETITIONER'S MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS AND EVIDENTIARY HEARING; GRANTING 69 LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
May 8, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 49 SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
March 10, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 47 RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 10, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
December 8, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 36 MOTION TO DISMISS; ADDRESSING PETITIONER'S PENDING MOTIONS: DENYING 44 , DENYING 34 , DENYING 23 , 24 , DENYING 25 ; SCHEDULING FILING OF ANSWER AND TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 8, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heidinger v. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Heidinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?