The Householder Group, LLLP v. Fuss

Plaintiff: The Householder Group, LLLP
Defendant: Randy S. Fuss
Counter-claimant: Randy S. Fuss
Counter-defendant: The Householder Group, LLLP
Case Number: 3:2007cv00573
Filed: January 29, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2008 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice upon settlemnet. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/10/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
September 23, 2008 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/22/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 22, 2008 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 83 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Householder Group, LLLP v. Fuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Householder Group, LLLP
Represented By: David H. Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy S. Fuss
Represented By: Amir H Tadjedin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Randy S. Fuss
Represented By: Amir H Tadjedin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: The Householder Group, LLLP
Represented By: William Joseph Acromite, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?