Huang v. Wieking et al

Plaintiff: John Huang
Defendant: Richard W. Wieking and Jeane Dekelver
Case Number: 3:2007cv00589
Filed: January 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 3/20/2007 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William B. Shubb. Joint case management statement due 14 days prior to the hearing date. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007) Modified on 2/16/2007 (kk, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL - Pursuant to Designation of a District Judge issued 2/6/07 by Ninth Circuit Chief Judge Mary Schroeder, the Hon. William B. Shubb, U.S. Senior District Judge for the Eastern District of California, is hereby assigned to this case. All pending dates of motions, case management conferences, and trial are hereby vacated and will be reset by newly assigned judge. Signed by U.S. District Court Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 2/13/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2007)
January 30, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/30/07. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Wieking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Wieking
Represented By: Steven J. Saltiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeane Dekelver
Represented By: Steven J. Saltiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Huang
Represented By: Joel H. Siegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?