Chatman v. Ayers

Petitioner: Erik Sanford Chatman
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 3:2007cv00640
Filed: January 31, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURAL MATTERS RELATED TO THE MIXED FINALIZED PETITION (DOC. 41) re 27 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Robert L. Ayers, Jr.. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/23/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 17, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EQUITABLE TOLLING by Judge William Alsup granting 17 Motion for Equitable Tolling (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
February 14, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 10 Motion for Administrative Relief from General Order 45 (VI)(G). (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2012: # 1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by the Federal Defender Services of Idaho, Inc. The office of the Federal Defender Services of Idaho, Inc. is appointed to represent Mr. Chatman in these proceedings. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2012: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatman v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erik Sanford Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?