Geo M. Martin Company et al v. Alliance Machine Systems International, LLC et al

Plaintiff: The Martin Family Trust - 1989 and Geo M. Martin Company
Defendant: Alliance Machine Systems International, LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv00692
Filed: February 2, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2009 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COSTS AND FEES RELATED TO TRIAL DELAY AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [denying 359 Motion for Attorney Fees]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
October 20, 2008 334 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING Further Settlement Conference for 10/29/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/20/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
September 19, 2008 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER to furnish refreshments for jury. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/19/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 10, 2008 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 10, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 5, 2008 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 5, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 3, 2008 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CHANGING START DATE OF TRIAL. Bench Trial set for 9/16/2008 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/3/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
February 4, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 4, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
February 8, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/8/07. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geo M. Martin Company et al v. Alliance Machine Systems International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Machine Systems International, LLC
Represented By: J. Thomas Vitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Martin Family Trust - 1989
Represented By: Lori L. Behun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geo M. Martin Company
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?