Baykeeper et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al

Plaintiff: Toxics Action Center, Soundkeeper, Oregon Wild, Peconic Baykeeper, National Center for Conservation Science and Policy, Environment Maine, California Sportfishing Protection Alliance, Californians for Alternatives to Toxics, Baykeeper and Waterkeeper Alliance
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency and Stephen L. Johnson
Case Number: 3:2007cv00725
Filed: February 5, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
November 13, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FURTHER STATUS REPORT. Joint Statement is due 1/15/10. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER R; FURTHER STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report due 11/6/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 3, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PROVIDE STATUS REPORT . Status report due 8/12/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
November 20, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PROVIDE STATUS REPORT . A Joint status report is due 12/5/08. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baykeeper et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toxics Action Center
Represented By: Charles M. Tebbutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soundkeeper
Represented By: Daniel E. Estrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Wild
Represented By: Daniel E. Estrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peconic Baykeeper
Represented By: Charles M. Tebbutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Center for Conservation Science and Policy
Represented By: Daniel E. Estrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environment Maine
Represented By: Daniel E. Estrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Represented By: Daniel E. Estrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics
Represented By: Daniel E. Estrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baykeeper
Represented By: Michael Robert Lozeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Charles M. Tebbutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Alan David Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L. Johnson
Represented By: Alan David Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?