Drew v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Robert Drew
Defendant: Bank of America, Fleet Credit Card Services, Citigroup, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transunion LLC, Bank One Cardmember Services, First USA Bank, N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A., FIA Card Services, N.A., Citibank (South Dakota) N.A. and AT&T Universal Card Services
Case Number: 3:2007cv00726
Filed: February 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL re 464 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting extension re 499 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010) Modified on 10/21/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER re: briefing schedule (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO 10/25/10 re 471 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER re: briefing (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 453 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 445 JURY INSTRUCTION - FINAL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 442 DRAFT VERDICT FORM (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO CONFORM TO PROOF OR TO CLARIFY SCOPE OF EXISTING COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
March 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS OF CHASE AND FIA FOR RECONSIDERATION, DENYING EQUIFAX'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, and DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND re 328 , 331 , 332 , 370 . Equifax and plaintiff shall attend a case management conference on 4/2/10 at 3:00 p.m.. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2010)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 370 Motion for Leave to File (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER RE: RECENTLY FILED MOTIONS re 331 , 332 . All motions will be set for hearing on 4/10/09 at 9:00 a.m..(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING: Plaintiff to file letter brief by no later than 2/23/09. Defendant's response, if any, must be filed by no later than 2/27/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 protective ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/1/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drew v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet Credit Card Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup
Represented By: Marcos D. Sasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Valli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank One Cardmember Services
Represented By: Pamela Jeanne Zanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First USA Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Pamela Jeanne Zanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Pamela Jeanne Zanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIA Card Services, N.A.
Represented By: Jordan Seungjin Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.
Represented By: Marcos D. Sasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Universal Card Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Robert Drew
Represented By: John Bradford Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?