Lemas v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Lemas
Defendant: Jill Brown
Case Number: 3:2007cv00958
Filed: February 15, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2009 187 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. In favor of defendant Donald Cecil and against plaitniff Ronald Lemans. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/26/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 24, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court JURY INSTRUCTIONS (DRAFT)(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 16, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Order re 174 . Signed by Judge Illston on 3/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009) Modified on 3/17/2009 (ts, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2009 172 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
October 21, 2008 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER driecting CDCR to Transfer Pltf to Solano for settlement purposes. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/21/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 20, 2008 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemas v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lemas
Represented By: Terry Ladell Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Brown
Represented By: Christopher Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?