Harrison v. Sample

Plaintiff: Marcus L. Harrison
Defendant: J. Sample
Case Number: 3:2007cv00959
Filed: February 15, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring Defendant to file and serve copy of settlement agreement. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 20, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING SETTLEMENT RELATED MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
January 19, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Each side shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating November 10, 2010 Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Vadas on November 8, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
May 12, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING ACTION TO MEDIATION PROGRAM (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Sample
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus L. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Sample
Represented By: Scott John Feudale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?