Lewis v. International Monetary Fund et al

Plaintiff: Roy Albert Lewis
Defendant: International Monetary Fund, Internal Revenue Service, District Director and Special Procedures Function Officer
Case Number: 3:2007cv01008
Filed: February 16, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston denying motions and dismissing action (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 22, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: service; setting brfing schedule and hrg re: motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/22/07. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2007 (nah, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relatedness. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/20/07. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2007 (nah, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. International Monetary Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Monetary Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Procedures Function Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Albert Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?