Martinez v. City and County of San Francisco

Plaintiff: John L Centurioni, Andrew Cohen, Michael P. Collins, Robert Del Torre, James P. Gaan, David Kranci, James Lewis, Michael Rebollini, Susan Rolovich, Michael Lawson, Martha Fabiani, Jack Wronski, Jeremiah Morgan, Mukesh Chandra and Cecile H. Porter
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2007cv01016
Filed: February 20, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2012 169 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATION RE APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/4/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
March 5, 2012 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation and Dismissing Defendants. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/5/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 10, 2012 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS BY PLAINTIFFS WHO FAIL TO SUBMIT SIGNED CLAIM FORMS OR APPEAR AT FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 152 Proposed Order filed by James Wilson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/10/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
December 21, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 7, 2011 REGARDING NOTICE AND DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE TO CLASS MEMBERS re 149 Stipulation filed by James Wilson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/21/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
July 5, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 133 Status Report, filed by James Wilson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/5/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
January 18, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 129 Joint Case Management Statement filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/18/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
November 16, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 127 Case Management Statement, filed by Andrew Cohen, Steve Moss, David D Wright, City and County of San Francisco, Mukesh Chandra, Michael P. Collins, Robert Del Torre, James Wilson, Jack Wronski, Jam es P. Gaan, Jeremiah Morgan, Michael Rebollini, James Lewis. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/16/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
August 27, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT re 120 Joint Case Management Statement, filed by Andrew Cohen, Steve Moss, David D Wright, City and County of San Francisco, Mukesh Chandra, Michael P. Collins, Robert Del Torre, James Wilson, Jack Wron ski, James P. Gaan, Jeremiah Morgan, Michael Rebollini, James Lewis. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/27/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
July 13, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING STAY OF PROCEEDINGS re 112 Stipulation filed by James Wilson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/13/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
March 13, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference. Further Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2009 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
January 30, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference. Further Settlement Conference set for 3/13/2009 01:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/30/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
November 19, 2008 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference. Further Settlement Conference set for 1/30/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/19/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
October 1, 2008 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/1/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 12, 2008 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF WILLIAM BRACONI re 97 Stipulation filed by James Wilson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/19/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
February 8, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 57 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 1, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 39 Motion for Conditional Certification (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Rose-Ellen Heinz Fairgrieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L Centurioni
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Cohen
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Collins
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Del Torre
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Gaan
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kranci
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lewis
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rebollini
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Rolovich
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lawson
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Fabiani
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Wronski
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Morgan
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mukesh Chandra
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecile H. Porter
Represented By: Mary J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?