Phelps v. United States Genearl Services Agency et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Phelps
Defendant: Robert Drakes, United States Genearl Services Agency, Michael Wirtz, Jeffrey Neely, Patricia Roberts and Mary Ghent
Case Number: 3:2007cv01055
Filed: February 21, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
March 18, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 92 Stipulation to Amend Briefing Schedule. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing and Case Management Conference are continued to 4/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/18/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010) Modified on 3/18/2010 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 5, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
November 30, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
June 17, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 15, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/22/2009.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/15/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
January 20, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 58 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
November 7, 2008 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 58 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 7, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
September 17, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 29 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
February 4, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffey S. White on 2/4/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phelps v. United States Genearl Services Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Drakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Genearl Services Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ghent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Phelps
Represented By: Waukeen Quandrico McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?