Korea Kumho Petrochemical Co Ltd v. Flexsys America LP et al

Plaintiff: Korea Kumho Petrochemical Co Ltd
Defendant: Flexsys America LP, Akzo Nobel Chemicals, Inc., Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V., Flexsys NV and Solutia, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv01057
Filed: February 21, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2008 129 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Flexsyss motion to dismiss the TAC is hereby GRANTED, and the TAC is hereby DISMISSED, as follows:1. The First, Second, and Third Causes of Action are hereby DISMISSED without leave to amend.2. The Fourth and Fifth Causes of Action are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to refiling in state court or any other appropriate forum. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
October 29, 2008 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT. The opposition shall be filed no later than October 29, 2008, and plaintiff's reply shall be filed no later than November 17, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 8, 2008 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT. Defendants' opposition shall be filed no later than October 28, 2008, and plaintiff's reply shall be filed no later than November 12, 2 008. The October 31, 2008 hearing is vacated, and will be reset after the Court makes its determination as to whether a suggestion of remand is appropriate. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 8, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 25, 2008 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE. The October 3, 2008 status conference is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 25, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korea Kumho Petrochemical Co Ltd v. Flexsys America LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexsys America LP
Represented By: Neil A. Benchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel Chemicals, Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V.
Represented By: Matthew E. Liebson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexsys NV
Represented By: David C. Minc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korea Kumho Petrochemical Co Ltd
Represented By: Robert G. Badal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?