Miller et al v. Rupf et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Miller, Mary Ann Vargas and Diane Schwartz
Defendant: Warren E. Rupf, Daryl England, Gary R. Stanton, Contra Costa County, Louis Cameron, Jonathan Wonlass, Paul M. Wilcox, Solano County, Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Brian Peterson and Gary Reiber
Case Number: 3:2007cv01137
Filed: February 26, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case pursuant to FRCP 41(b). The clerk is directed to terminate all motions, enter judgment in favor of defendants and close the file. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
October 28, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting doc 109 Exparte application to increase page limit for motion for summary judgment filed by Forensic Medical Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/28/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
September 11, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Based upon the stipulation of the Parties, the deadlines on the designation of experts and production of expert reports, designation of rebuttal experts and production of rebuttal expert reports and expert discovery cutoff are postposed until after the 12/10/2009 dispositive motion hearing. The parties will propose new deadlines once the court has ruled on the dispositive motions, re doc 87 filed by Gary Reiber, Brian Peterson, Forensic Medical Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/11/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
August 7, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re discovery dates. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 4, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to appear 8/6/2009 for discovery hearing re 69 Letter filed by Daryl England, Contra Costa County, Warren E. Rupf, 75 Letter filed by Brian Peterson, 63 Letter filed by Daryl England, Contra Costa County, Warren E. Rupf (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 20, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending discovery cutoffs. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Rupf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren E. Rupf
Represented By: Steven Patrick Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl England
Represented By: Steven Patrick Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Stanton
Represented By: Matthew Ross Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Represented By: Steven Patrick Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Wonlass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County
Represented By: Matthew Ross Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forensic Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Erin R. Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Peterson
Represented By: Erin R. Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Reiber
Represented By: Erin R. Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Miller
Represented By: William Victor Campisi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Vargas
Represented By: William Victor Campisi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Schwartz
Represented By: William Victor Campisi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?